This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/22/2022 at 21:37:10 (UTC).

Federick et al v. Bossier Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 Federick filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Bossier Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott D. Johnson, Brian A. Jackson and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

Referral Judges

Scott D. Johnson

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP

Foster-Wheeler, LLC

J. Melton Garrett

Georgia-Pacific, LLC

Sea Drilling Corporation

Rapid American Corporation

Phillips

Ingersoll-Rand Company

Union Carbide Corporation

The McCarty Corporation

Crane Co.

Travelers Indemnity Company

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Albert Bossier Jr.

Riley Power, Inc.

Certainteed Coporation

Phillips Chemical Holding Company

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

International Paper Company

Ingersoll Rand Company

Cross Claimant and Defendant

J. Melton Garrett

Cross Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

International Paper Company

69 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Peter R. Tafaro

Attorney at Frilot, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Deborah Kuchler

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC

1615 Poydras Street, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michael H. Abraham

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz

701 Poydras St., Ste 4350

New Orleans, LA 70139

Janice Marie Culotta

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

3600 Poydras Street, Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70112

Nicole M. Loup

Attorney at Sulzer & Williams, LLC

201 Holiday Blvd., Suite 335

Covington, LA 70433

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Arthur Wendel Stout, III

Attorney at Deutsch, Kerrigan & Stiles

755 Magazine St.

New Orleans, LA 70130-3672

Gary A. Lee

Attorney at Lee, Futrell & Perles

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4120

New Orleans, LA 70170-4120

Timothy F. Daniels

Attorney at Irwin, Fritchie, Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Ebony Shadae Morris

Attorney at Garrison, Yount, Forte & Mulcahy, LLC

909 Poydras Street, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70112

Jeffrey M. Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer & Sommers, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey M. Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer & Sommers, LLC

616 Girod Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

Alex Robertson

Attorney at Huber Thomas & Marcelle

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jennifer D. Zajac

Attorney at The Lahatte Law Firm

2000 Clearview Parkway, Suite 203

Metairie, LA 70001

Douglas R. Elliott

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163-1132

Richard J. Garvey, Jr

Attorney at Hailey McNamara Hall Larmann & Papale LLC

One Galleria Blvd, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

Adam D. deMahy

1515 Poydras St.., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Daphne Marie Lancaster

Attorney at Lee, Futrell & Perles, LLP

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 4120

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jason Kirk Elam

Attorney at Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2215

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward T. Hayes

Attorney at Leake and Andersson, LLP

1700 Energy Centre, 1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Christopher Kelly Lightfoot

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale

One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

103 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#110

(#110) ORDER granting #109 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant The McCarthy Corporation, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with Plaintiffs and Defendant to bear their respective costs and expenses, reserving all rights of Plaintiffs against all other parties. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/25/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

109 #1

Attachment

109 #109

Main Document

#108

(#108) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#107

(#107) FINAL JUDGMENT: The above-captioned action be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/6/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#106

(#106) NOTICE of Settlement by Dustie Federick (Colley, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#105

(#105) ORDER granting #103 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a) (1) (A) (ii), all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with Plaintiffs and Defendant to bear their respective costs and expenses, reserving all rights of Plaintiffs against all other parties. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/4/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

103 #1

Proposed Pleading;

103 #103

Main Document

1 #10

Attachment State Court Record - Part 6

1 #9

Attachment State Court Record - Part 5

1 #8

Attachment State Court Record - Part 4

1 #7

Attachment State Court Record - Part 3

1 #6

Attachment State Court Record - Part 2

1 #5

Attachment State Court Record - Part 1

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

146 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) ORDER granting #109 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant The McCarthy Corporation, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with Plaintiffs and Defendant to bear their respective costs and expenses, reserving all rights of Plaintiffs against all other parties. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/25/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Joint MOTION to Dismiss The McCarty Corporation With Prejudice by McCarty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Kinler, Douglas) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) FINAL JUDGMENT: The above-captioned action be and is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/6/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#106) NOTICE of Settlement by Dustie Federick (Colley, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) ORDER granting #103 Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 (a) (1) (A) (ii), all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with Plaintiffs and Defendant to bear their respective costs and expenses, reserving all rights of Plaintiffs against all other parties. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/4/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) RULING and ORDER : The #97 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All of Defendants claims against cross-claimants and third-party Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, reserving to Defendant all rights and claims against all other persons and/or entities. The #83 Motion for Summary Judgment is TERMINATED as moot. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/30/2021. (ELW) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Lightfoot, Christopher) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached correspondence advises the court that the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants have been dismissed entirely and the parties have reached a settlement. Counsel shall file the Joint Notice of Settlement as contemplated by Local Civil Rule 16(c) by no later than 8/6/2021. The settlement conference set for 8/3/2021 is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/30/2021. (BLR) Modified to edit text on 8/2/2021 (BLR). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) NOTICE AND ORDER: Pursuant to the attached correspondence, IT IS ORDERED that Zurich American Insurance Company is excused from attendance at the 8/3/2021 settlement conference in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/29/2021. (BLR) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
98 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Richard M. Crump and Shelley K. Napolitano to Withdraw as Attorney by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Crump, Richard) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp.,, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company.. (Reimonenq, Simeon) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/28/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/09/2020. (NLT) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The McCarty Corporation. (Oubre, Louis) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • Docket(#5) There is no record document 5. Entered in error by case administrator (KMW) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter to Attorney Gary A. Bezet regarding Sarah K. Weissman who is Co-Counsel for party Georgia-Pacific, LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Attorney Jeanette Riggins regarding Thomas L. Cougill who is Co-Counsel for party Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc. for Lamorak Insurance Company.. (Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial DIstrict Court, Case Number C-644344. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2098407), filed by OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment State Court Record - Part 1, #6 Attachment State Court Record - Part 2, #7 Attachment State Court Record - Part 3, #8 Attachment State Court Record - Part 4, #9 Attachment State Court Record - Part 5, #10 Attachment State Court Record - Part 6)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COM is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. PHILLIPS is a litigant

Latest cases where CHEVRON PHILLIPS CHEMICAL COMPANY LP is a litigant

Latest cases where McCarty Corporation is a litigant