This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:58:55 (UTC).

Federici Brands LLC v. Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Federici Brands LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Fit Glow Healthcare Private Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01928

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federici Brands LLC

Defendant

Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tony Miodonka

Attorney at Finn Dixon & Herling LLP

6 Landmark Square, Suite 600

Stamford, CT 06901

John P Margiotta

Attorney at Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.

151 West 42Nd Street, Ste 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Daniel Michael Nuzzaci

Attorney at Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.

151 West 42Nd Street, Ste 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

David Donahue

Attorney at Fross Zelnick Lehrman & Zissu, P.C.

151 West 42Nd Street, Ste 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Jared Robinson Smith

Attorney at Rothken Law Firm

3 Hamilton Lndg, Ste 280

Novato, CA 94949

David A. Slossberg

Attorney at Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC

147 North Broad St.

Milford, CT 06460-0112

Ira P Rothken

Attorney at Rothken Law Firm

3 Hamilton Landing, Suite 280

Novato, CA 94949

Sara Ann Sharp

Attorney at Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff, LLC

147 N. Broad Street

Milford, CT 06604

 

Court Documents

#1

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

27 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit

#27

(#27) MOTION for Attorney(s) Jared R. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5627409) by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Slossberg, David) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#26

(#26) MOTION for Attorney(s) Ira P. Rothken to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5627396) by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Slossberg, David) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#4

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

26 #2

Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing

#28

(#28) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 2, 2020, NUNC PRO TUNC, to Plead by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Slossberg, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Ira P Rothken on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Rothken, Ira) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

26 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Robinson Smith on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Smith, Jared) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#3

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

27 #2

Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Robinson Smith on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Smith, Jared) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Appearance by Ira P Rothken on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Rothken, Ira) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER Granting #27 Motion for Attorney Jared R. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2020. (Velez, F.) Modified on 1/17/2020 to correct event to indicate granting (Velez, F.). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro hac vice as to Ira P. Rothken. Signed by Clerk on 01/15/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer deadline updated to 3/2/2020 per Dkt. 29. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading and conduct Rule 26(f) planning conference until 03/02/2020. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause as required by Local Rule 7, which requires counsel to show why, in the exercise of due diligence, counsel was not able to meet the presumptively reasonable deadline established by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/13/2020. (Nault, James) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 2, 2020, NUNC PRO TUNC, to Plead by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Slossberg, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for Attorney(s) Jared R. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5627409) by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Slossberg, David) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Attorney(s) Ira P. Rothken to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5627396) by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Slossberg, David) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Ann Sharp on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Sharp, Sara) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Miodonka, Tony) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2020; Discovery due by 6/6/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federici Brands LLC. (Miodonka, Tony) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5580025.), filed by Federici Brands LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miodonka, Tony) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.