This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2021 at 07:06:36 (UTC).

Federer v. The Abbott Laboratories et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Federer filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against The Abbott Laboratories. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric N. Vitaliano and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05352

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric N. Vitaliano

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denise P. Federer

Defendants

GlaxoSmithKline LLC,

The Abbott Laboratories

Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc.

Carnick Laboratories, Inc.

Dart Industries Inc.

Eli Lilly and Company

Kremers-Urban Co.

Lannett Co., Inc

McNeilab, Inc.

Mallinckrodt Inc.,

SmithKline Beecham Corp.

Merck & Co, Inc.

Rhone-Poulenc Rorer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Rowell Laboratories, Inc.

E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc.

The Upjohn Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A London

Attorney at Douglas & London

59 Maiden Lane, 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10038

Defendant Attorneys

Samuel J. Abate, Jr.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

Jessica Carol Wilson

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly and Company (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc.. (Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc.. (Wilson, Jessica) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketORDER Counsel are directed to confer and, by December 7, 2021, shall jointly advise the Court, via ECF, whether they desire an initial conference before the Court in this DES case or prefer to submit a joint proposed schedule for discovery and other pretrial matters. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 11/23/2021. (LK) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eli Lilly and Company (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Eli Lilly and Company. (Abate, Samuel) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano for all further proceedings. Judge Frederic Block no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 9/29/2021. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketFILING FEE: $ 402.00, receipt number 4653160135 (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Denise P. Federer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rowell Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Burroughs-Wellcome & Co., Inc. is a litigant