This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:37:41 (UTC).

Federal Trade Commission v. Noland, et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Federal Trade Commission filed an Other lawsuit against Noland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Trade Commission

Defendants

James D Noland, Jr.

Success By Media LLC

Success By Media Holdings Incorporated

Lina Noland

Thomas G. Sacca

Thomas G Sacca, Jr.

Jay Noland

JD Noland

Scott A Harris

Thomas G Sacca

Nicholasville, KY 40356

Success By Media Holdings Incorporated a corporation doing business as Success By Health doing business as Success By Media

Success By Media LLC a limited liability company doing business as Success By Health doing business as Success By Media

Receiver

Kimberly Friday

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Evan Michael Mendelson

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

600 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Mailstop Cc-9528

Washington, DC 20580

Jonathan Wesley Ware

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission - Washington, DC

600 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw, Mailstop Cc10528

Washington, DC 20580

Defendant and Receiver Attorneys

Leon Benjamin Silver

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Renaissance Sq., 2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Mary Margaret Curtin

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Renaissance Sq., 2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Rachel Leigh Werner

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Renaissance Sq., 2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Damon WD Wright

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - Alexandria, VA

1101 King St., Ste. 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

Andrew S Jacob

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Renaissance Sq., 2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Rebecca Noel Cain

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Renaissance Sq., 2 N Central Ave., Ste. 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Daniel Baca Mestaz

Attorney at Williams Mestaz LLP

6225 N 24Th St., Ste. 125

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Daryl M Williams

Attorney at Williams Mestaz LLP

6225 N 24Th St., Ste. 125

Phoenix, AZ 85016

David Griffith Eisenstein

Attorney at Law Offices of David G Eisenstein PC

P.O. Box 1202

Carlsbad, CA 92018

Kimberly Irene Friday

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

Warren John Stapleton

Attorney at Osborn Maledon PA

P.O. Box 36379

Phoenix, AZ 85067-6379

 

Court Documents

147 #1

Exhibit Replacement Exhibit B

#147

146 #3

Exhibit B

146 #2

Exhibit A (second half)

146 #1

Exhibit A (first half)

#146

144 #4

Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Second Motion for Fees and Costs Incurred

144 #3

Exhibit C

#144

#6

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

#4

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#2

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

287 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) NOTICE of Errata re: #146 Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendants Scott A Harris, James D Noland, Jr, Lina Noland, Thomas G Sacca.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Replacement Exhibit B)(Williams, Daryl) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) RESPONSE in Opposition re: #144 MOTION for Attorney Fees Receiver's Second Motion for Order Approving Fees and Costs Incurred by the Receiver and Estate Professionals filed by Scott A Harris, James D Noland, Jr, Lina Noland, Thomas G Sacca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (first half), #2 Exhibit A (second half), #3 Exhibit B)(Williams, Daryl) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl M Williams on behalf of Thomas G Sacca. (Williams, Daryl) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) MOTION for Attorney Fees Receiver's Second Motion for Order Approving Fees and Costs Incurred by the Receiver and Estate Professionals by Kimberly Friday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Second Motion for Fees and Costs Incurred by the Receiver and Estate Professionals)(Stapleton, Warren) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Mendelson, Evan) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2020. Dispositive motions due by 3/12/2021 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/28/20. (MAW) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the parties' joint Rule 26(f) report (Doc. #137 ), concludes it is unnecessary to hold a Rule 16 Case Management Conference. The Court will separately issue the Case Management Order. Counsel are to note at Item 11 of the Case Management Order that the deadlines are real, and the Court will enforce the deadlines set forth in the Order. The parties should plan their litigation activities accordingly. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/28/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#140) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Receiver's Petition to Permit Recovery of Personal Assets (Doc. #138 ) is granted. The Receiver is permitted to release the equipment identified in Exhibit A to the Receiver's Petition to Robert Towns. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/28/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) NOTICE re: Notice of Filing Receiver's Second Written Report by Kimberly Friday re: #109 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stapleton, Warren) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) MOTION The Receiver's Petition No. 2 to Permit Recovery of Personal Assets by Kimberly Friday. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting The Receiver's Petition No. 2 to Permit Recovery of Personal Assets)(Stapleton, Warren) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
128 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SEALED Recommendations for Temporary Receiver by Federal Trade Commission. (SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED Rule 65(b)(1) Certification and Declaration of Evan M. Mendelson in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 by Federal Trade Commission. (SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SEALED Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Asset Freeze, MOTION for Appointment of Temporary Receiver, and MOTION for Limited Expedited Discovery, and Other Equitable Relief #7 by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 4, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 5, #6 Exhibit 1 Part 6, #7 Exhibit 1 Part 7, #8 Exhibit 1 Part 8, #9 Exhibit 1 Part 9, #10 Exhibit 1 Part 10, #11 Exhibit 1 Part 11, #12 Exhibit 1 Part 12, #13 Exhibit 1 Part 13, #14 Exhibit 1 Part 14, #15 Exhibit 1 Part 15, #16 Exhibit 1 Part 16, #17 Exhibit 1 Part 17, #18 Exhibit 1 Part 18, #19 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #20 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #21 Exhibit 3, #22 Exhibit 4, #23 Exhibit 5, #24 Exhibit 6, #25 Exhibit 7, #26 Exhibit 8)(SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEALED EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Asset Freeze, MOTION for Appointment of Temporary Receiver, and MOTION for Limited Expedited Discovery, and Other Equitable Relief by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SEALED ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that FTC's ex parte motion to file a brief in excess of the local page limits #5 is granted. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/8/20. (cc: Plaintiff's counsel Evan Mendelson and Jonathan Ware). (SLQ) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (SLQ). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SEALED EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of the Page Limit by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Submitted by Federal Trade Commission. (SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief (TRO Requested, separate motion filed) filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Temporarily Seal the Docket and Entire File, and Memorandum in Support by Federal Trade Commission. This seal shall remain in effect for ten days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 1/8/20. (cc: Plaintiff's counsel Evan Mendelson and Jonathan Ware). (SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEALED EX PARTE MOTION to Seal Temporarily Seal the Docket and Entire File, and Memorandum in Support by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLQ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Success By Media LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Warren John Stapleton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly Irene Friday