This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2020 at 20:44:27 (UTC).

Federal Trade Commission v. First Choice Horizon LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Federal Trade Commission filed an Other lawsuit against First Choice Horizon LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leslie R. Hoffman and Paul G. Byron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01028

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Trade Commission

Defendants

Carlos S. Guerrero

South Premier Trust LLC

First United Mutual LLC

Joshua Hernandez

Suncoast Mutual LLC

Premier Union Trust LLC

First Southern Trust LLC

Carlos Sinencio Guerrero

Raymond Gonzalez

First Choice Horizon LLC

Southern Choice LLC

Financial Service Trust LLC

Sun Premier LLC

United Choice Plus LLC

Southern Pride LLC

Receiver

Mark J. Bernet

Tampa, FL 33602-5250

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Boutros

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

Suite 1500, 225 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30303-1729

Barbara E. Bolton

Attorney at Federal Trade Commission

Suite 1500, 225 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30303-1729

Defendant Attorneys

Robert D. Eckard

Attorney at Robert Eckard & Associates, PA

3110 Alt Us Hwy 19 N

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Beth Ann Tobey

Attorney at Law Office of Robert Eckard & Associates, P.A.

3110 Alternate Us 19 North

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

Receiver Attorney

Mark James Bernet

Attorney at Akerman LLP - Tampa

401 E Jackson St Ste 1700

Tampa, FL 33602-5250

 

Court Documents

#83

(#83) ORDER denying #67 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/12/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#82

(#82) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting #81 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/31/2020. (JRR) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#81

(#81) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #60 MOTION for Payment for Services Rendered and Reimbursement for Costs Incurred filed by Mark J. Bernet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/15/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#67

(#83) ORDER denying #67 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/12/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

60 #2

Exhibit B

60 #1

Exhibit A

#60

(#81) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #60 MOTION for Payment for Services Rendered and Reimbursement for Costs Incurred filed by Mark J. Bernet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/15/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

57 #3

Exhibit C

57 #2

Exhibit B

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Temporarily Seal Case Filing. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/3/19. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Barbara Bolton re #4 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#6

(#6) SUGGESTION of Receiver by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM in support re #4 Motion for temporary restraining order filed by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#4

(#7) DECLARATION of Barbara Bolton re #4 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#3

(#9) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/3/19. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Temporarily Seal Case Filing. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/3/19. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction and other Equitable Relief against All Defendants filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) ORDER denying #67 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/12/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) ORDER granting #60 Motion for Attorney Fees; adopting #81 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 1/31/2020. (JRR) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #60 MOTION for Payment for Services Rendered and Reimbursement for Costs Incurred filed by Mark J. Bernet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/15/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) ORDER denying without prejudice #57 Motion for Contempt for Failure to Respond to Records Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/17/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER granting #77 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court accepts the parties' Amended Stipulated Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/17/2019. (JRR) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#78) ENDORSED ORDER directing the parties to email the AMENDED STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION as a Word document to CHAMBERS_FLMD_BYRON@flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/17/2019. (JRR) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) AMENDED STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Federal Trade Commission. (Boutros, Michael) Modified on 12/13/2019 (RDO). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #62 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (See Doc. 75). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/22/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Financial Service Trust LLC, First Choice Horizon LLC, First Southern Trust LLC, First United Mutual LLC, Raymond Gonzalez, Carlos S. Guerrero, Joshua Hernandez, Premier Union Trust LLC, South Premier Trust LLC, Southern Choice LLC, Southern Pride LLC, Sun Premier LLC, Suncoast Mutual LLC, United Choice Plus LLC re #62 MOTION for Robert D. Eckard and Beth Ann Tobey to withdraw as attorney filed by Sun Premier LLC, Financial Service Trust LLC, Southern Choice LLC, South Premier Trust LLC, Premier Union Trust LLC, Suncoast Mutual LLC, First Choice Horizon LLC, First United Mutual LLC, United Choice Plus LLC, Southern Pride LLC, First Southern Trust LLC, Raymond Gonzalez, Carlos S. Guerrero, Joshua Hernandez (Tobey, Beth) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ENDORSED ORDER granting #72 Motion to Stay Ruling. The Court will stay ruling on the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. 62) through December 6, 2019. The Plaintiffs' counsel is reminded that it remains counsel of record and shall continue to represent the Plaintiffs and comply with all rules and orders of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 11/5/2019. (MDH) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Filing Supporting Declarations (Vol. I) by Federal Trade Commission (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 part 3, #3 part 4, #4 part 5, #5 part 6, #6 part 7, #7 part 8)(RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/3/19. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Temporarily Seal Case Filing. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/3/19. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION of Barbara Bolton re #4 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUGGESTION of Receiver by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in support re #4 Motion for temporary restraining order filed by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) EX PARTE MOTION for temporary restraining order by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EX PARTE MOTION for leave to file under seal entire file and docket by Federal Trade Commission. (RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction and other Equitable Relief against All Defendants filed by Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LTD FINANCIAL SERVICES is a litigant