This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 11:24:18 (UTC).

Federal Trade Commission et al v. Methodist Le Bonheur Healthcare et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 Federal Trade Commission filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Methodist Le Bonheur Healthcare. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tu M. Pham and Sheryl H. Lipman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02835

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tu M. Pham

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

State of Tennessee Office of the Attorney General and Reporter

Federal Trade Commission

Defendants

Tenet Healthcare Corporation

Methodist Le Bonheur Healthcare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeanette Pascale

Tennessee Attorney Generals Office, P.O. 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

James R. Newsom, III

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL AND REPORTER

40 S. Main St., Suite 1014

Memphis, TN 38103

Matthew Reed Dowty

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, One Commerce Square, 40 South Main Street

Memphis, TN 38103

John David McDowell

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, Cpad, 500 Charlotte Avenue

Nashville, TN 37243

Christopher Dunbar

Tennessee Attorney General'S Office, 315 Deaderick Street

Nashville, TN 37243

Susan Musser

Attorney at FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION

400 7Th St Sw, Washington

Washington, DC 20024

Jennifer Milici

Attorney at Federal Trade Commision

600 Pennsylvania Ave. Nw

Washington, DC 20580

Melissa C. Hill

Attorney at FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION

600 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20580

Rohan Pai

Attorney at FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION

600 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20580

Amy Ritchie

Attorney at FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION

600 Pennsylvania Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20580

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Reilly

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Brittany Lischinsky

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Richard Hale Cunningham, I

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Tammy Tsoumas

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Victor J. Domen, Jr.

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202

Tara L Reinhart

Attorney at SKADDEN ARPS SLATE MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

1440 New York Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

David P. Wales

Attorney at SKADDEN ARPS SLATE MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#51

#50

#49

#47

#46

44 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

44 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#44

#43

#10

#6

#5

#4

3 #2

Exhibit Proposed Order

2 #2

Exhibit Order to Seal

2 #1

Memorandum

#2

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/23/2020. (shl) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/23/2020. (shl) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Federal Trade Commission. (Milici, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket(#48) TEXT NOTICE RE-SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The parties are hereby notified that the Scheduling Conference currently set for Thursday, January 7, 2021 has been ADVANCED to Wednesday, January 6, 2021 at 10:00 AM via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (smm) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Reed Dowty on behalf of State of Tennessee Office of the Attorney General and Reporter (Dowty, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Newsom, III on behalf of State of Tennessee Office of the Attorney General and Reporter (Newsom, James) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. [**TEXT ONLY ORDER--NO IMAGE ATTACHED.**] Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/15/20. (Lipman, Sheryl) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew J. Reilly (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3504668) by Tenet Healthcare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanette Pascale on behalf of State of Tennessee Office of the Attorney General and Reporter (Pascale, Jeanette) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/8/2020. (shl) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Methodist Le Bonheur Healthcare. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Judge Mark S. Norris and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REDACTION to #2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Sealed Complaint , #1 Sealed Complaint Proposed Redactions by Federal Trade Commission. (Musser, Susan) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Proposed Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Musser, Susan) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Musser, Susan) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Seal Document #1 Sealed Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Order to Seal)(Musser, Susan) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEALED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Musser, Susan) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methodist Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases where Tenet Health Care Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tammy Ann Tsoumas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara L. Reinhart