This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 07:08:26 (UTC).

Federal Savings Bank et al v. Wesco Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Federal Savings Bank filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wesco Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01857

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Federal Savings Bank

Stephen M Calk

Defendant

Wesco Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel S Hefter

Attorney at Hefter Law Limited

22 W Washington, Ste. 1500

Chicago, IL 60602

Rolf Nathaniel Clarkson

Attorney at Anderson Clarkson Johns Brown PLLC

2812 N Norwalk, Ste. 106

Mesa, AZ 85215

Defendant Attorney

Daniel A Ellerbrock

Attorney at Gregerson Rosow Johnson & Nilan Limited

100 Washington Ave. S, Ste. 1550

Minneapolis, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20035884 filed by Federal Savings Bank, Stephen M Calk. (Clarkson, Rolf) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Savings Bank identifying Other Affiliate National Bancorp Holdings Incorporated for Federal Savings Bank. (Clarkson, Rolf) (MCO) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20035884. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1857-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/4/2021. (RMV) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE re: Certificate of Service by Stephen M Calk, Federal Savings Bank . (Hefter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellerbrock, Daniel) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint, the deadline for Defendant Wesco Insurance Company to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 2/2/2022. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/29/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellerbrock, Daniel) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel A Ellerbrock on behalf of Defendant Wesco Insurance Company. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Notice (Other) filed by Stephen M Calk, Federal Savings Bank. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(1). No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SMH) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE re: Certificate of Service by Stephen M Calk, Federal Savings Bank . (Hefter, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Daniel S Hefter on behalf of Plaintiffs Stephen M Calk, Federal Savings Bank. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketRemark: Out of state attorney Daniel S Hefter terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/4/2021. (RMV) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20035884. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1857-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Savings Bank identifying Other Affiliate National Bancorp Holdings Incorporated for Federal Savings Bank. (Clarkson, Rolf) (MCO) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20035884 filed by Federal Savings Bank, Stephen M Calk. (Clarkson, Rolf) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(MCO) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel A. Ellerbrock