This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2022 at 08:05:42 (UTC).

Federal National Mortgage Association v. Cordova

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Federal National Mortgage Association filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Cordova. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy C. Batten, Sr and Justin S. Anand. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05274

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal National Mortgage Association

Defendant

Efrain Cordova

Lithonia, GA 30058

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dominique Young

Attorney at Aldridge Pite, LLP

Suite 5003575 Piedmont Rd., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30305

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Efrain Cordova. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number GAN100135139) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/29/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days after the date of this Order why this action should not be remanded to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant is advised that if he fails to respond to this Order, this action may be remanded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/11/2022. (dmb) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Dominique Young. Clerk to follow-up by 2/3/2022. (nmb) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#4

(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Efrain Cordova be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Dekalb County for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/31/2022. (dmb) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/31/2022. (dmb) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. The Clerk is directed to remand this action to the Magistrate Court of Dekalb County and close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 02/18/2022. (jkb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Remand Letter back to DeKalb Magistrate Court (jkb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#8

(#8) Odyssey File & serve Receipt to DeKalb Magistrate Court re #7 Letter (jkb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Odyssey File & serve Receipt to DeKalb Magistrate Court re #7 Letter (jkb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Efrain Cordova, Attorney Dominique Young for Federal National Mortgage Association re #6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (jkb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (jkb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Remand Letter back to DeKalb Magistrate Court (jkb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation. The Clerk is directed to remand this action to the Magistrate Court of Dekalb County and close this case. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 02/18/2022. (jkb) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Efrain Cordova re #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation, #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Efrain Cordova. (dmb) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/31/2022. (dmb) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Efrain Cordova be remanded to the Magistrate Court of Dekalb County for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to terminate the reference of this matter to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/31/2022. (dmb) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #2 Order to Show Cause to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (dmb) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Dominique Young. Clerk to follow-up by 2/3/2022. (nmb) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Efrain Cordova re #2 Order to Show Cause. (dmb) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days after the date of this Order why this action should not be remanded to the Magistrate Court of DeKalb County for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant is advised that if he fails to respond to this Order, this action may be remanded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on 1/11/2022. (dmb) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Efrain Cordova. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number GAN100135139) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant