This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:51:47 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. CAMPBELL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CAMPBELL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and D. BROCK HORNBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00272

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

D. BROCK HORNBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendant and Counter Claimant

DEBORAH E CAMPBELL

Interested Party

ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY M. LOWN

Attorney at COUGHLIN, RAINBOTH, MURPHY AND LOWN

439 Middle Street

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Interested Party, Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

JASON DIONNE

Attorney at ISAACSON AND RAYMOND, P.A.

P.O. Box 891

Lewiston, ME 04243

 

Court Documents

#11

#6

1 #19

Exhibit S - 5/10/18 Seterus correspondence

1 #18

Exhibit R - 4/13/18 request for loan modification

1 #17

Exhibit Q - quitclaim deed

1 #16

Exhibit P - closing disclosure

1 #15

Exhibit O - 9/20/17 Seterus letter

1 #14

Exhibit N - P$S agreement

1 #13

Exhibit M - 1/26/16 fax

1 #12

Exhibit L - 8/4/14 fax

1 #11

Exhibit K - loan modification

1 #10

Exhibit J - release deed

1 #9

Exhibit I - 6/3/13 load modification request

1 #7

Exhibit G - abstract of divorce judgment

1 #6

Exhibit F - settlement agreement

1 #5

Exhibit E - assignment into FNMA

1 #4

Exhibit D - mortgage

1 #1

Exhibit A - warranty deed

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : ORAL ARGUMENT set for 8/21/2019 11:30 AM in Portland Courtroom 2 before JUDGE D. BROCK HORNBY. (clp) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA. (DIONNE, JASON) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LOWN, BRADLEY) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Set Deadlines as to FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION : Per Local Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/1/2019. (clp) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION by DEBORAH E CAMPBELL.(DIONNE, JASON) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. Reply due by 8/5/2019. (LOWN, BRADLEY) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties by ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA (DIONNE, JASON) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA Responses due by 8/5/2019. (DIONNE, JASON) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Set Answer Deadline for DEBORAH E CAMPBELL per summons returned executed 7/3/19: Answer due by 7/24/2019. (clp) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Set Answer Deadline for ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA. Summons returned executed 6/25/19: Answer due by 7/16/2019. (clp) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. DEBORAH E CAMPBELL served on 7/3/2019. (LOWN, BRADLEY) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA served on 6/25/2019. (LOWN, BRADLEY) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2037008.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LOWN, BRADLEY) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to DEBORAH E CAMPBELL, ISAACSON & RAYMOND PA. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Isaacson & Raymond, PA summons)(bfa) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against DEBORAH E CAMPBELL PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (Service of Process Deadline 9/11/2019) Fee due by 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - warranty deed, #2 Exhibit B - disclosure form, #3 Exhibit C - note, #4 Exhibit D - mortgage, #5 Exhibit E - assignment into FNMA, #6 Exhibit F - settlement agreement, #7 Exhibit G - abstract of divorce judgment, #8 Exhibit H - 6/3/13 ownership letter and deed, #9 Exhibit I - 6/3/13 load modification request, #10 Exhibit J - release deed, #11 Exhibit K - loan modification, #12 Exhibit L - 8/4/14 fax, #13 Exhibit M - 1/26/16 fax, #14 Exhibit N - P$S agreement, #15 Exhibit O - 9/20/17 Seterus letter, #16 Exhibit P - closing disclosure, #17 Exhibit Q - quitclaim deed, #18 Exhibit R - 4/13/18 request for loan modification, #19 Exhibit S - 5/10/18 Seterus correspondence, #20 Exhibit T - 5/14/18 letter, #21 Exhibit U - 7/20/18 correspondence, #22 Exhibit V - 7/31/18 correspondence, #23 Exhibit W - payoff quote)(bfa) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant