This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 08:05:31 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION v. AVEAU et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AVEAU. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00334

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

RICHARD G AVEAU

KARENA E AVEAU

Interested Party

MAINE REVENUE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHN A. DOONAN

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

RENEAU J. LONGORIA

Attorney at DOONAN, GRAVES & LONGORIA LLC

100 Cummings Center, Suite 225D

Beverly, MA 01915

Interested Party Attorney

KEVIN J. CROSMAN

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Six State House Station

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants, Richard G. Aveau and Karena E. Aveau by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Responses due by 10/1/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

8 #1

Affidavit

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(CROSMAN, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 7/19/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. KARENA E AVEAU served on 7/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. RICHARD G AVEAU served on 7/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to KARENA E AVEAU, RICHARD G AVEAU, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First Attached Document: Karena E. Aveau Summons (Attachments: #1 Richard G. Aveau Summons, #2 Maine Revenue Services Summons)(mnw) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

1 #9

Exhibit I - Affidavit Relating to Military Search

1 #8

Exhibit H - Demand Letter

1 #7

Exhibit G - Loan Modification

1 #6

Exhibit F - Quitclaim Assignment to Federal National Mortgage Association

1 #5

Exhibit E - Assignment of Mortgage to Metlife Home Loans

1 #4

Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage to Federal National Mortgage Association

1 #3

Exhibit C - Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit B - Note

1 #1

Exhibit A - Legal Description

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against KARENA E AVEAU & RICHARD G AVEAU filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2019) Fee due by 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage to Federal National Mortgage Association, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment of Mortgage to Metlife Home Loans, #6 Exhibit F - Quitclaim Assignment to Federal National Mortgage Association, #7 Exhibit G - Loan Modification, #8 Exhibit H - Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(mnw) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Entry of Default (no answer or responsive pleading having been filed) as to KARENA E AVEAU, RICHARD G AVEAU Check for Filing of a Motion for Default Judgment on 10/11/2019. By Rodrigue, DEPUTY CLERK. (jwr) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendants, Richard G. Aveau and Karena E. Aveau by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION Responses due by 10/1/2019. (DOONAN, JOHN) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Check for Filing of a Motion for Default on 9/12/2019 as to KARENA E AVEAU, RICHARD G AVEAU. (sfw) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(CROSMAN, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for MAINE REVENUE SERVICES : Answer due by 8/9/2019. (sfw) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Set Answer Deadline Regarding Complaint for RICHARD G AVEAU, KARENA E AVEAU : Answer due by 8/12/2019. (sfw) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. MAINE REVENUE SERVICES served on 7/19/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. KARENA E AVEAU served on 7/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. RICHARD G AVEAU served on 7/22/2019. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. (LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-2051190.), filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION.(LONGORIA, RENEAU) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION by 7/24/2019. (mnw) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to KARENA E AVEAU, RICHARD G AVEAU, MAINE REVENUE SERVICES. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). First Attached Document: Karena E. Aveau Summons (Attachments: #1 Richard G. Aveau Summons, #2 Maine Revenue Services Summons)(mnw) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (mnw) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against KARENA E AVEAU & RICHARD G AVEAU filed by FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2019) Fee due by 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Legal Description, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment of Mortgage to Federal National Mortgage Association, #5 Exhibit E - Assignment of Mortgage to Metlife Home Loans, #6 Exhibit F - Quitclaim Assignment to Federal National Mortgage Association, #7 Exhibit G - Loan Modification, #8 Exhibit H - Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit Relating to Military Search)(mnw) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal National Mortgage Association is a litigant