This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/23/2022 at 06:22:38 (UTC).

Federal Insurance Company v. Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Federal Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05273

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Insurance Company

Defendant

Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Cummins

Attorney at Gibson & Robb

275 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joshua A. Southwick

Attorney at Gibson Robb & Lindh LLP

100 First Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorney

Andrew D Kehagiaras

Attorney at Roberts and Kehagiaras LLP

100 West Broadway Suite 660

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

21 #1

*Restricted*

21 #21

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#20

(#20) TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3028, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer. Case transferred electronically 6/17/2022. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

19 #1

Exhibit A

19 #19

Main Document

#17

(#18) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO COURT'S ORDER AND FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On March 25, 2022, the court ordered the parties to file a Joint Report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) by June 3, 2022. (Dkts. #15 , #17 ). The parties failed to file the Joint Report. Counsel shall file the report no later than June 10, 2022. The Scheduling Conference is continued to June 24, 2022 at 1:00 PM. Counsel are reminded to adhere to the deadlines set by the court. Any future failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Exhibit

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#18) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO COURT'S ORDER AND FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On March 25, 2022, the court ordered the parties to file a Joint Report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) by June 3, 2022. (Dkts. #15 , #17 ). The parties failed to file the Joint Report. Counsel shall file the report no later than June 10, 2022. The Scheduling Conference is continued to June 24, 2022 at 1:00 PM. Counsel are reminded to adhere to the deadlines set by the court. Any future failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 01/05/2022)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:21-cv-10016. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TRANSFER ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3028, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Paul A. Engelmayer. Case transferred electronically 6/17/2022. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT REPORT of RE MDL ORDER AND SETTLEMENT filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO COURT'S ORDER AND FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On March 25, 2022, the court ordered the parties to file a Joint Report pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) by June 3, 2022. (Dkts. #15 , #17 ). The parties failed to file the Joint Report. Counsel shall file the report no later than June 10, 2022. The Scheduling Conference is continued to June 24, 2022 at 1:00 PM. Counsel are reminded to adhere to the deadlines set by the court. Any future failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Cormac J. Carney, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-07655 CJC(ASx) (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Topocean Consolidation Service Los Angeles Inc.. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company, identifying Federal Insurance Company - insurer of cargo; Drive DeVilbiss Healthcare - cargo owner. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32549908 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Joshua A Southwick added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Southwick, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOPOCEAN CONSOLIDATION SERVICE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew D Kehagiaras