This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/23/2022 at 06:19:21 (UTC).

Federal Insurance Company v. AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Federal Insurance Company filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul A. Engelmayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05245

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Engelmayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Insurance Company

Defendant

Ait Worldwide Logistics Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul J. Kozacky

Attorney at Kozacky Weitzel McGrath, P.C.

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60601

Caitlin Johanna Brown

Attorney at Kozacky Weitzel McGrath, PC

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60601

Brian P. O'Connor

Attorney at Kozacky Weitzel Mcgrath P.C.

77 West Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Lee Reeb

Attorney at Marwedel, Minichello & Reeb, P.C.

303 W Madison Street, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60606

Kenderick Mason Jordan

Attorney at Marwedel, Minichello & Reeb, P.C.

303 W Madison Street, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

26 #1

*Restricted*

26 #26

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#25

(#25) TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of New York the electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#24

(#24) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to The Southern District of New York. Mailed notice(jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

15 #1

Exhibit exhibit A

15 #15

Main Document

14 #3

Exhibit exhibit 3

14 #2

Exhibit exhibit 2

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03028-PAE. (laq) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Illinois Northern; Case Number: 1:21-cv-06383. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of New York the electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to The Southern District of New York. Mailed notice(jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 2/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company by Paul J. Kozacky (Kozacky, Paul) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company by Caitlin Johanna Brown (Brown, Caitlin) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. (dxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (cxr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cxr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Federal Insurance Company (O'Connor, Brian) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Federal Insurance Company by Brian P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Brian) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Connor, Brian) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Federal Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18917351. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(O'Connor, Brian) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 6/22/2022.] (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Lee Reeb