This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 09:31:40 (UTC).

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Guild Mortgage Company LLC

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Guild Mortgage Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01832

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

Defendant

Guild Mortgage Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Andrew Levin

Attorney at Mortgage Recovery Law Group LLP

550 North Brand Boulevard Suite 1100

Glendale, CA 91203

Douglas T. Hoffman

Attorney at Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation

3501 Fairfax Avenue, Vs-E-7006

Arlington, VA 22226

Lauren M Gibbs

Attorney at Mortgage Recovery Law Group LLP

550 North Brand Boulevard Suite 1100

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorneys

James William Brody

Attorney at Johnston Thomas Law Offices

1400 North Dutton Avenue Suite 21

Santa Rosa, CA 95401

Richard Charles O'Hare

Attorney at Johnston Thomas Law Offices

1400 North Dutton Suite 21

Santa Rosa, CA 95401

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:22-cv-01832 CJC(JDEx). (rn) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Douglas T. Hoffman's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank, designating Paul A. Levin as local counsel. (hr) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas T. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard Charles O'Hare counsel for Defendant Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Adding James W. Brody as counsel of record for Guild Mortgage Company LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (O'Hare, Richard) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard Charles O'Hare counsel for Defendant Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Adding Richard C. O'Hare as counsel of record for Guild Mortgage Company LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Attorney Richard Charles O'Hare added to party Guild Mortgage Company LLC(pty:dft))(O'Hare, Richard) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. upon Guild Mortgage Company LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Richard C. O'Hare. (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Douglas T. Hoffman on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (et) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

6 #1

CV11C Statement of Consent

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#4

(#4) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#3

(#3) *Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint* filed as CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (Levin, Paul) Modified on 10/7/2022 (et). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:22-cv-01832 CJC(JDEx). (rn) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #12 Non-Resident Attorney Douglas T. Hoffman's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank, designating Paul A. Levin as local counsel. (hr) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas T. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard Charles O'Hare counsel for Defendant Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Adding James W. Brody as counsel of record for Guild Mortgage Company LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (O'Hare, Richard) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard Charles O'Hare counsel for Defendant Guild Mortgage Company LLC. Adding Richard C. O'Hare as counsel of record for Guild Mortgage Company LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (Attorney Richard Charles O'Hare added to party Guild Mortgage Company LLC(pty:dft))(O'Hare, Richard) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. upon Guild Mortgage Company LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2022, answer due 12/6/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Richard C. O'Hare. (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Douglas T. Hoffman on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Guild Mortgage Company LLC. (et) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 CV11C Statement of Consent) (et) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. correcting Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint* filed as CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (Levin, Paul) Modified on 10/7/2022 (et). (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Paul Andrew Levin added to party Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Mutual Bank(pty:pla))(Levin, Paul) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Guild Mortgage Company, a California Corporation is a litigant