This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:46 (UTC).

Feather River Tribal Health, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Feather River Tribal Health, Inc filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-45334

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Feather River Tribal Health, Inc.

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.

Beverly Sackler

Allergan Sales, LLC

Richard S. Sackler

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Actavis Kadian LLC

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.

Insys Therapeutics Inc.

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Crystal Gayle Foley

Attorney at Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC

100 North Sepulveda Boulevard Suite 1350

El Segundo, CA 90245

Scott Wayne Williams

Attorney at Berkey Williams

2030 Addison Street

Berkeley, CA 94704

Rovianne Amber Leigh

Attorney at Berkey Williams LLP

2030 Addison Street Suite 410

Berkeley, CA 94704

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

3 #1

CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul J Hanly, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#6

(#6) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (iva) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23662556 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Feather River Tribal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Crystal Gayle Foley added to party Feather River Tribal Health, Inc.(pty:pla))(Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#8

(#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 5:19-cv-00823. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#7

(#7) Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-92) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2804, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio and assigned to Honorable Dan A. Polster. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central. Case number 5:19-cv-00823. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-92) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2804, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Ohio and assigned to Honorable Dan A. Polster. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (iva) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul J Hanly, Jr.. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23662556 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Feather River Tribal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Crystal Gayle Foley added to party Feather River Tribal Health, Inc.(pty:pla))(Foley, Crystal) [Transferred from cacd on 5/17/2019.] (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.