This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2021 at 09:05:37 (UTC).

Feather-Gorbey v. Vest et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 Feather-Gorbey filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Vest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas E. Johnston. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00354

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas E. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

(Chief) Col. Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey

Beaver, WV 25813

Defendants

Edwards

Vest

Fain

Williams

Co. Raban

John or Jane Doe

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISMISSAL ORDER The #1 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs is DENIED, and the Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; directing the Clerk remove this case from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/12/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S ORDER. For reasons appearing to the court, this case is reassigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston for all pretrial and trial proceedings. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 6/23/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT. (btm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION by Michael S. Owl Feather-Gorbey to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (btm)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fain is a litigant

Latest cases where Edwards is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAMS is a litigant

Latest cases where VEST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant