This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:26:50 (UTC).

Feaster v. Watts

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Feaster filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Watts. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank D. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00413

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Clevon Feaster

Gaffney, SC 29340

Defendant

Michael Watts

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER of Instructions to Plaintiff Pursuant to Standing Order 3:19-mc-54. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns 8/27/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) Pro Se COMPLAINT against Michael Watts, filed by Christopher Clevon Feaster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope)(mek) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER of Instructions to Plaintiff Pursuant to Standing Order 3:19-mc-54. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns 8/27/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Christopher Clevon Feaster. (mek) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (mek). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Pro Se COMPLAINT against Michael Watts, filed by Christopher Clevon Feaster. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope)(mek) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less