This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2023 at 06:10:54 (UTC).

Feaster v. Schlumberger et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Feaster filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Schlumberger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeremy D. Kernodle and K. Nicole Mitchell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Kernodle

Referral Judge

K. Nicole Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Feaster

Bossier City, LA 71112

Defendants

Schlumberger

Cameron, a Schlumberger Company

Jose Daniel Gonzalez

Kirby McFadden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

James Hunter Nye

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Houston

800 Capitol St., 24Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Rachael Elizabeth Thompson

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP - Houston

800 Capitol St., 24Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/12/2023. (wea, ) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#24

(#24) ORDER ADOPTING #23 Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss #12 and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims in this case with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/12/2023. (wea, ) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#23

(#23) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court RECOMMENDS that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #12 be GRANTED and that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/15/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#22

(#22) RESPONSE in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cameron, a Schlumberger Company, Jose Daniel Gonzalez, Kirby McFadden. (Nye, James) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

20 #20

Main Document

12 #3

Text of Proposed Order

12 #2

Exhibit A

12 #1

Affidavit of Rachael E. Thompson

12 #12

Main Document

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Cameron, a Schlumberger Company, Jose Daniel Gonzalez, Kirby McFadden, Schlumberger, and forwarded to US Marshal for service. (wea, ). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons. The Court, having determined that appointment of the United States Marshal to serve process is necessary and appropriate in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#4

(#4) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#3

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#2

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons. The Court, having determined that appointment of the United States Marshal to serve process is necessary and appropriate in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/12/2023. (wea, ) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER ADOPTING #23 Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion to dismiss #12 and DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims in this case with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 1/12/2023. (wea, ) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court RECOMMENDS that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #12 be GRANTED and that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/15/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cameron, a Schlumberger Company, Jose Daniel Gonzalez, Kirby McFadden. (Nye, James) (Entered: 10/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendants shall have seven (7) additional days to file their reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss, and such reply shall be due on or before October 13, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/5/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Cameron, a Schlumberger Company, Jose Daniel Gonzalez, Kirby McFadden. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nye, James) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to #18 Response to Non-Motion (i.e., Opposition to Plaintiff's Response to Show Cause Order) filed by Cameron, a Schlumberger Company, Jose Daniel Gonzalez, Kirby McFadden. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nye, James) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to #15 Order to Show Cause filed by Kenneth Feaster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(wea, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Feaster. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(wea, ) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Kenneth Feaster as to #15 Order to Show Cause. Received on 9/22/2022. (ndc) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed Cameron, a Schlumberger Company. Process sent certified mail and confirmed received on 6/28/2022, signed by Kirby McFadden, answer due 7/19/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kirby McFadden. Process sent certified mail and confirmed received on 6/28/2022, signed by Kirby McFadden, answer due 7/19/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Cameron, a Schlumberger Company, Jose Daniel Gonzalez, Kirby McFadden, Schlumberger, and forwarded to US Marshal for service. (wea, ). (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons. The Court, having determined that appointment of the United States Marshal to serve process is necessary and appropriate in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/22/2022. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent form to Plaintiff. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Kenneth Feaster. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Feaster. (wea, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cameron, a Schlumberger Company, Jose Daniel Gonzalez, Kirby McFadden, Schlumberger, filed by Kenneth Feaster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wea, ) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less