This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2021 at 07:22:44 (UTC).

Fear of God, LLC v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Fear of God, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03894

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fear of God, LLC

Defendants

The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"

2017 Clothes Store

kawaiigoods Store

Shop3904042 Store

UUMAYSARI-clothing Store

popular phone cases Store

Shop4882072 Store

JAYK FANS Apparel Store

Karry Excellents Dropshipping Store

Shop5050138 Store

DSA SayHello Store

QNPQYX Dropshipping Store

NAGRI Official Store

JCPSMT Store

FUNY LOO Store

Bud Evan Store

Sheng Yue Qi Store

Shop910774023 Store

QUANLITY 3 Store

177 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin R. Gaudio

Attorney at Greer Burns & Crain Ltd

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Crout Ziegler

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 S. Wacker Dr., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin Francis Trainor

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd.

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

RiKaleigh C. Johnson

Attorney at Greer, Burns & Crain

300 South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #38 is taken under advisement. Any objections or responses are due by 09/24/2021. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#42

(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #37 , defendants liu qiangcas, kabelsalat, and youxixianshuiyirenbaihuodian are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#41

(#41) NOTICE by Fear of God, LLC re MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for entry of default MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants #38 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

40 #1

Exhibit 1

#40

(#40) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #39 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

39 #1

Exhibit 1

#39

(#39) MEMORANDUM by Fear of God, LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #38 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#38

(#38) MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fear of God, LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #38 is taken under advisement. Any objections or responses are due by 09/24/2021. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #37 , defendants liu qiangcas, kabelsalat, and youxixianshuiyirenbaihuodian are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE by Fear of God, LLC re MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for entry of default MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants #38 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #39 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MEMORANDUM by Fear of God, LLC in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #38 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fear of God, LLC as to certain defendants (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNEW PARTIES: 2017 Clothes Store, kawaiigoods Store, Shop3904042 Store, UUMAYSARI-clothing Store, popular phone cases Store, Shop4882072 Store, JAYK FANS Apparel Store, Karry Excellents Dropshipping Store, Shop5050138 Store, DSA SayHello Store, QNPQYX Dropshipping Store, NAGRI Official Store, JCPSMT Store, FUNY LOO Store, Bud Evan Store, Sheng Yue Qi Store, Shop910774023 Store, QUANLITY 3 Store, Seesert 2 Store, FEEDMIX Store, Shop911129198 Store, Shop911136121 Store, Lantun's Store, Shangzhijia Store, Carhart-Clothing Store, KAKAMING Store, sneakerboy Store, Shop911427148 Store, NINE 911 Store, Shop911483014 Store, Pinrus Wardrobe Apparel Store, sin yan Store, Shop911554257 Store, Shop911604374 Store, Ins-China Store, officee Store, YUN CHAO Store, O-Fashion Store, AS Women Clothes Store, dengguoping Store, HanLu Franchise Store, Northern lights Men's Store, TYDFYNJH Store, goodOKay Store, D--THREE Store, PSYSL Store, LUCK'S LUCY 123 Store, A+Good quality Store, Eric Trend Store, PY 007 Store, Suit TianyuDAHF Store, 998866 Store, BLF474977298 Store, man002 Store, aini7 Store, Shop1541436384 Store, Ethereal life Store, A8585 Store, 555852525 Store, Super-Quality Store, MIAOGE Store, SZYOGJ Store, shanxigangyongwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, Hongtongxian Dahuaishu zhenqinbicun Yanyanzonghepi, shanghaisonglanjixieyouxiangongsi, Lixi Commercial Store, lianchengxianboweiwobaihuodian, Flurry of Demons, liu qiangcas, ZheMeHaoKanDeHaiShiKanJinDian, WANGWBO, kabelsalat, FLYBA, LEVBJYGUYIOU, luochuntaodianpu, Richstate, youxixianshuiyirenbaihuodian, Wu Xiaolong, XIAONIAOYIYI, gongyinxing1, A3AYVKNOF4VU8V, Pbig, LUWEIWE, Chunzongyuan mechanical equipment, Taizigeus, putianshixiuyuquyuetangtengzhenghaishuiyangzhichan, WEIZHE, QingchuangXunda, DJSW, Little chick Store, AXSMYXGS, LiZhenBinMaoYi, MarrLu, ChengYueBaiHuo, LouisPA, LAOGA, Hogtaqu, qingdaoyoushijiujiuyanjingyouxiangongsi, mikico998, bensimmons26, wheretobuyparka, kxcypk, brandshoesgot, fancanjie123, gllll, bestqualityclothes, ztufei, Luckinvoker, suplulu, ottto, Uksukusa, annasports, lcd1991, brilliant_clothing, yjh_030, lululemens, heitf, lulu_kuzi, longqiaoys, lukuzi, d2hat, echoalwaysarises, ehqt48, ew5t4_95, hgeng_52, kdlsajhdklask, model_collect, nhd_77, ruyipalace, saadsgfda, sogalss520, sox-4069, umayexfe2, w.trade, wnr349, xijinping2013, xinpinwan0, yuanch3349, zhanghuaming65, zzhh520, zhouchanghong1984, Firstcode E-co, sunblack, fleisneon, jhgfdh, Ig Niu Bi, Bo Yu Yi Cheng, wsqz520, HSWYZ, heuyd25, cloth-FS, tyiwdffuu, kujrytrtgg, lwg654, buxishangde1, Comunicaciones Mendoza C.A, RenjiaxingcV, maguangcai, Melidakk, Johndhj, slayciezkhpby, shithaezmvwrbq, Glen H Core, DERRICKHORNE, bchtereaew, 2301caozhiyao, zhangtian0, hgoyihaya, Tidal YH, shenhongbing, zykwh5shop, fengbaoqing, Shoes s, kfudh97u, khtp, Southwest SxS, poesjes, avstamningar, shibutam, yuhaiyang4900, chicamadrilo, Jardena Gold 22, zhangxuewen7906, Lil One Hunnet, Open Heart Natural way, Brain Gym Stadium, Murray Up and Wait, yilexcin, citongtinlan, fashionbaobi, huangmeiqin3627, fashionjinkai, doirjiuer, chenmenglong5904 and amdkfkwkfkw added to case caption. (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PRELIMINARY Injunction Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/20/2021. Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:On the grounds set forth in the motion, plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction #30 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC by Martin Francis Trainor (Trainor, Martin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Fear of God, LLC Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Fear of God, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18484951. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gaudio, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fears is a litigant

Latest cases where The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin Francis Trainor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RiKaleigh C. Johnson