This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/06/2019 at 07:04:14 (UTC).

FAZIO et al v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 FAZIO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. KEARNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00500

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. KEARNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VINCENT FAZIO

DEBRA BONNEVILLE

Defendant

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINCENT J. DOTO

Attorney at WHEELER DIVLIO & BARNABEI

1617 John F Kennedy Blvd Suite 1270

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

YOLANDA KONOPACKA DESIPIO

Attorney at BENNETT, BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG

960 Harvest Dr, Bldg B Ste 100

Blue Bell, PA 19422

WILLIAM HOFMANN

Attorney at BENNETT BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG LLC

960 Harvest Dr, Building B Suite 100

Blue Bell, PA 19422-1900

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT THE ARBITRATION CLERK SHALL SCHEDULE THE ARBITRATION HEARING NO EARLIER THAN 6/24/19 AND NO LATER THAN 7/8/19. THE PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FRCP 26(A) WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. DISCOVERY, TO THE EXTENT IT HAS NOT BEGUN, SHALL BEGIN IMMEDIATELY. SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 5/21/19.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/12/19. 2/12/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. COPY FORWARDED TO ARBITRATION CLERK.(fdc) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 6/26/2019 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(ahf) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint together with And Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY for STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(ahf) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 181001701. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 191983)(ahf) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTIONS DUE BY 5/21/2019. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/21/2019. (fdc, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER THAT THE ARBITRATION CLERK SHALL SCHEDULE THE ARBITRATION HEARING NO EARLIER THAN 6/24/19 AND NO LATER THAN 7/8/19. THE PARTIES SHALL EXCHANGE THE REQUIRED INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FRCP 26(A) WITHIN SEVEN (7) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. DISCOVERY, TO THE EXTENT IT HAS NOT BEGUN, SHALL BEGIN IMMEDIATELY. SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS, IF ANY, SHALL BE FILED NO LATER THAN 5/21/19.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 2/12/19. 2/12/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. COPY FORWARDED TO ARBITRATION CLERK.(fdc) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Hearing: ARBITRATION HEARING SET FOR 6/26/2019 09:30 AM IN Philadelphia.(ahf) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint together with And Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(HOFMANN, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (ahf) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, A MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY for STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(ahf) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 181001701. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 191983)(ahf) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William H Hofmann(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOLANDA KONOPACKA DESIPIO