This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 09:37:13 (UTC).

Fayyaz v. UHS of Hartgrove Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Fayyaz filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against UHS of Hartgrove Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01570

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Imran Fayyaz

Defendants

UHS of Hartgrove Inc

Steven Airhart

UHS of Hartgrove Inc doing business as Hartgrove Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Josh Michael Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Josh Friedman

53 West Jackson, #1028

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of Second Amended General Order 20-0012, the status hearing of 04/17/2020 is reset to 06/11/2020 at 9:15 a.m., with the joint status report due three business days in advance. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

7 #1

Status Report Requirements

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 04/17/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. In light of current public-health concerns, for any hearing not involving a witness under oath, any party or lawyer wishing to appear by phone rather than in person may email a request with a direct-dial phone number to Judge Chang's courtroom deputy, Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov, before 1:00 p.m. on the business day prior to the hearing date. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Imran Fayyaz by Josh Michael Friedman (Friedman, Josh) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#3

(#3) (PDF not legible) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Imran Fayyaz by Josh Michael Friedman (Friedman, Josh) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 3/4/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Friedman, Josh) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Imran Fayyaz; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16791043. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Josh) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of Second Amended General Order 20-0012, the status hearing of 04/17/2020 is reset to 06/11/2020 at 9:15 a.m., with the joint status report due three business days in advance. Mailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 04/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 04/17/2020 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. In light of current public-health concerns, for any hearing not involving a witness under oath, any party or lawyer wishing to appear by phone rather than in person may email a request with a direct-dial phone number to Judge Chang's courtroom deputy, Michael_Wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov, before 1:00 p.m. on the business day prior to the hearing date. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Imran Fayyaz by Josh Michael Friedman (Friedman, Josh) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) (PDF not legible) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Imran Fayyaz by Josh Michael Friedman (Friedman, Josh) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 3/4/2020 (bg, ). (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Friedman, Josh) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Imran Fayyaz; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16791043. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Josh) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less