This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2019 at 07:39:30 (UTC).

Favre v. DS Smith Plc et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Favre filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DS Smith Plc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claude M. Hilton and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01151

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Favre

Defendants

DS Smith Plc

Interstate Resources, Inc.

DS Smith USA Corporation

James Morgan

DS Smith Holdings, Inc.

Susan Newman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Michael Poteet

Attorney at Carr Maloney PC (DC)

2020 K St Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20006

Matthew D. Berkowitz

Attorney at Carr Maloney PC (DC)

2020 K St Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20006

Charles Clinton Frye

Attorney at Carr Maloney PC (DC)

2020 K St Nw, Suite 850

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Notice

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

1 #2

Exhibit 1-14

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to DS Smith Holdings, Inc., DS Smith Plc, DS Smith USA Corporation, Interstate Resources, Inc., James Morgan, Susan Newman. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Ryan Michael Poteet terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 10/15/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Berkowitz on behalf of Mark Favre (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to DS Smith PLC by Mark Favre. (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to DS Smith Holdings Inc. by Mark Favre. (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to DS Smith USA Corporation by Mark Favre. (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Interstate Resources Inc. by Mark Favre. (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to James Morgan by Mark Favre. (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint to Susan Newman by Mark Favre. (Berkowitz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mark Favre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poteet, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6822215.), filed by Mark Favre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-14)(Poteet, Ryan) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Interstate Resources, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew D Berkowitz