This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2022 at 10:32:16 (UTC).

Faville et al v. First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Faville filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First American Property Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ann L. Aiken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01197

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann L. Aiken

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffrey Faville

Halley Faville

Defendant

First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick M. Millard

Attorney at Millard & Bragg, Attorneys at Law P.C.

419 5Th Street

Oregon City, OR 97045

Douglas M. Bragg

Attorney at Millard & Bragg, P.C.

419 Fifth Street

Oregon City, OR 97045

Defendant Attorneys

Robert C. Muth

Attorney at Kilmer Voorhees & Laurick, PC

2701 Nw Vaughn St., Suite 780

Portland, OR 97210

Robert Selden May

Attorney at Kilmer Voorhees & Laurick, PC

2701 Nw Vaughn St., Suite 780

Portland, OR 97210

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/14/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/13/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 1/13/2023. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/17/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (May, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#6

(#6) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (May, Robert) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (May, Robert) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by First American Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (May, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/17/2022 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/14/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/13/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 1/13/2023. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (bd) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Filed by FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (May, Robert) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV25246 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8620507. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by FIRST AMERICAN PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit). (May, Robert) Modified on 8/15/2022 to add payment information(ecp). (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TRUSTEE SERVICING SOLU- is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C. Muth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert S May