This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2020 at 09:08:43 (UTC).

Favatella, Nick et al v. AmGUARD Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Favatella, Nick filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AmGUARD Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00815

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nick Favatella

Carol Favatella

Defendant

AmGUARD Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Ray Graff

Attorney at Mayer, Graff & Wallace, LLP

1425 Memorial Drive

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Joshua Michael Greatsinger

Attorney at Mayer, Graff & Wallace, LLP

1425 Memorial Drive

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Defendant Attorneys

Craig Jacobson

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1 North Franklin, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

Ryan Thomas Brown

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

1 North Franklin, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

Geoffrey J. Repo

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1 North Franklin, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 12/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due 9/20/2021. Settlement Letters due 1/7/2022. Motions in Limine due 1/14/2022. Response to Motion due 1/28/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/21/2020. (rks) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#11

(#11) Brief in Reply by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Jacobson, Craig) Modified on 10/14/2020. (lak) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#10

(#10) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jacobson, Craig) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#9

(#9) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Carol Favatella, Nick Favatella re: #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by AmGUARD Insurance Company (Graff, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

8 #4

Exhibit 4 - Pretrial Order

8 #3

Exhibit 3 - Greystone Complaint

8 #2

Exhibit 2 - Policy

8 #1

Exhibit 1 - Favatella Complaint

#8

(#8) Brief in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Favatella Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Greystone Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pretrial Order) (Jacobson, Craig) Modified on 9/14/2020. (lak) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. Brief in Opposition due 10/2/2020. Brief in Reply due 10/13/2020. (Jacobson, Craig) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Geoffrey J. Repo for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Repo, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#4

(#4) Motion to Admit Geoffrey J. Repo Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2743713.) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Repo, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Jacobson for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jacobson, Craig) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Brown, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #3

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Service of Process Transmittal, Summons and Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 12/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due 9/20/2021. Settlement Letters due 1/7/2022. Motions in Limine due 1/14/2022. Response to Motion due 1/28/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/21/2020. (rks) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/20/2020 [:10] (cak) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Brief in Reply by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). (Jacobson, Craig) Modified on 10/14/2020. (lak) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/09/2020 at 01:00 PM rescheduled to 10/20/2020 at 02:30 PM to accommodate the court's calendar. Counsel for the Plaintiff remains responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. (cak) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jacobson, Craig) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Carol Favatella, Nick Favatella re: #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by AmGUARD Insurance Company (Graff, Ryan) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketSet Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Brief in Support of #7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Favatella Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Greystone Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pretrial Order) (Jacobson, Craig) Modified on 9/14/2020. (lak) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. Brief in Opposition due 10/2/2020. Brief in Reply due 10/13/2020. (Jacobson, Craig) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Geoffrey J. Repo for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Repo, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Geoffrey J. Repo Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/8/2020. (lak) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to Admit Geoffrey J. Repo Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2743713.) by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Repo, Geoffrey) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (rks) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (rks) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig Jacobson for Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Jacobson, Craig) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Brown, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Dane County, case number 2020CV001566. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2742950), filed by AmGUARD Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of Process Transmittal, Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brown, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Jacobson