This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2020 at 09:07:38 (UTC).

Faulkner v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Faulkner filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against Union Pacific Railroad Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00366

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leticia Faulkner

Defendants

Union Pacific Railroad Co.

Union Pacific Railroad Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn M. Sassaman

Attorney at BERN, CAPPELLI LAW FIRM

101 West Elm Street, Suite 215

Conshohocken, PA 19428

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 10/23/2020. (Sassaman, Shawn) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MLF) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Requested as to Plaintiff regarding Complaint, #1 . (Sassaman, Shawn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Co. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4235776), by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Leticia Faulkner (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Sassaman, Shawn) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 10/23/2020. (Sassaman, Shawn) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MLF) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Requested as to Plaintiff regarding Complaint, #1 . (Sassaman, Shawn) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Co. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4235776), by Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman on behalf of Leticia Faulkner (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Sassaman, Shawn) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less