This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:45:09 (UTC).

Faulkner v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Faulkner filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02565

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerome Dewayne Faulkner

Defendant

Andrew Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald Clifton Dewberry

Attorney at Attorney at Law

9555 W Sam Houston Parkway S, Suite 285

Houston, TX 77099

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RETURN of Service Executed as to The United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas on 8/6/2020 re: Summons and Complaint, filed.(jdav, 4) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, filed. Copy of Complaint, Order Granting IFP, issued summons and USM 285 forwarded to the USM for service. (jdav, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Jerome Dewayne Faulkner. (Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis granted July 17, 2020 by the Honorable Andrew S. Hanen)(jdav, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less