This case was last updated from PACER on 03/23/2020 at 07:33:45 (UTC).

Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc. v. HDI Global Specialty SE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Fastcash Pawn Checkcashers, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HDI Global Specialty SE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc.

Defendant

HDI Global Specialty SE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Monica Horan

Attorney at Horan Law Office

393 Armistice Boulevard, 725-7368, Fax: 726-2460

Pawtucket, RI 02861

Defendant Attorney

Kara Thorvaldsen

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

260 Franklin Street

Boston, MA 02110-1727

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by HDI Global Specialty SE.(Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against HDI Global Specialty SEfiled by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc., d/b/a FCP Diamonds, LLC(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc.. Responses due by 3/17/2020. (Horan, Monica) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#9

(#9) RULE 16 STATEMENT by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#8

(#8) RULE 16 STATEMENT Statement of Claim by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc.. (Horan, Monica) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 2/25/2020 at 09:15 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc.. (Horan, Monica) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by HDI Global Specialty SE.(Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#3

(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 3 Return of Service

1 #4

Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit 1 Complaint

1 #2

Appendix Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Appendix Amended Complaint

#1

(#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc.. Responses due by 3/17/2020. (Horan, Monica) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by HDI Global Specialty SE.(Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against HDI Global Specialty SEfiled by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc., d/b/a FCP Diamonds, LLC(Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting as unopposed #10 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint- So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/3/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc.. Responses due by 3/17/2020. (Horan, Monica) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketTEXT PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close on 6/25/2020; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 8/25/20; Defendant's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed by 9/25/20 - So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/25/2020. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 2/25/2020; Monica Horan and Kara Thorvaldsen participated (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 16 STATEMENT by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 16 STATEMENT Statement of Claim by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc.. (Horan, Monica) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Tuesday, 2/25/2020 at 09:15 AM before Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fastcash Pawn & Checkcashers, Inc.. (Horan, Monica) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by HDI Global Specialty SE.(Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HDI Global Specialty SE identifying Corporate Parent Talanx AG, Other Affiliate HDI Global SE, Other Affiliate Hannover Re SE for HDI Global Specialty SE.. (Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2019-11373. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1466754, filed by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Amended Complaint, #2 Appendix Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 Return of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hicks, Alyson) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HDI Global Specialty SE identifying Corporate Parent Talanx AG, Other Affiliate HDI Global SE, Other Affiliate Hannover Re SE for HDI Global Specialty SE.. (Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2019-11373. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1466754, filed by HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Amended Complaint, #2 Appendix Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 Return of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thorvaldsen, Kara) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less