This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2023 at 19:33:12 (UTC).

Fashion Nova, LLC v. Blush Mark, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2022 Fashion Nova, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Blush Mark, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rozella A. Oliver and Ronald S.W. Lew. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-06127

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

Presiding Judge

Ronald S.W. Lew

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fashion Nova, LLC

Defendants

Blush Mark, Inc.

Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John F Olsen

Attorney at Ferdinand IP LLP

Building F, 2500 Broadway Suite F125

Santa Monica, CA 90404

Defendant Attorneys

Brian J. Beck

Attorney at Zuber Lawler LLP

111 West Jackson Street, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Joshua M. Masur

Attorney at Zuber Lawler LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 32Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

26 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to Appear at Hearing by Zoom

#26

(#26) STIPULATION for Leave to Allow Counsel to Appear by Zoom at the 1.31.23 Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by plaintiff Fashion Nova, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to Appear at Hearing by Zoom)(Olsen, John) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#25

(#25) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS THE SECOND CLAIM FOR RELIEF FOR COPYRIGHT MANAGEMENT INFORMATION VIOLATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #17 filed by Defendants Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc., Blush Mark, Inc.. (Beck, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

24 #3

Exhibit O'Neal Complaint

24 #2

Exhibit Kirk Kara Complaint

#24

(#24) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS THE SECOND CLAIM FOR RELIEF FOR COPYRIGHT MANAGEMENT INFORMATION VIOLATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #17 filed by Plaintiff Fashion Nova, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Olsen Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit Kirk Kara Complaint, #3 Exhibit O'Neal Complaint, #4 Exhibit Crowley Complaint, #5 Exhibit Copyright Registrations)(Olsen, John) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Declaration

#17

(#24) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS THE SECOND CLAIM FOR RELIEF FOR COPYRIGHT MANAGEMENT INFORMATION VIOLATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #17 filed by Plaintiff Fashion Nova, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Olsen Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit Kirk Kara Complaint, #3 Exhibit O'Neal Complaint, #4 Exhibit Crowley Complaint, #5 Exhibit Copyright Registrations)(Olsen, John) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Olsen, John) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Olsen, John) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California limited liability company identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Olsen, John) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A to Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The hearing on the NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Second Claim For Relief For Copyright Management Information Violations From Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint #17 , set for 1/31/2023, at 10:00 AM, is hereby vacated and taken OFF CALENDAR. The motion is suitable for decision without oral argument and stands SUBMITTED. No appearance necessary on 1/31/2023. Therefore, the STIPULATION for Leave to Allow Counsel to Appear by Zoom #26 is denied as moot. The Courts ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) STIPULATION for Leave to Allow Counsel to Appear by Zoom at the 1.31.23 Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by plaintiff Fashion Nova, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Leave to Appear at Hearing by Zoom)(Olsen, John) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS THE SECOND CLAIM FOR RELIEF FOR COPYRIGHT MANAGEMENT INFORMATION VIOLATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #17 filed by Defendants Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc., Blush Mark, Inc.. (Beck, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS THE SECOND CLAIM FOR RELIEF FOR COPYRIGHT MANAGEMENT INFORMATION VIOLATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #17 filed by Plaintiff Fashion Nova, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Olsen Declaration in Support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit Kirk Kara Complaint, #3 Exhibit O'Neal Complaint, #4 Exhibit Crowley Complaint, #5 Exhibit Copyright Registrations)(Olsen, John) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #22 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Blush Mark, Inc. and Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc., designating Joshua M. Masur as local counsel. granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Brian J. Beck (rolm) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian J. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc., Blush Mark, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34501261) filed by defendants Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc., Blush Mark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua M. Masur in Support of Application, #2 Proposed Order) (Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING BY TWENTY-ONE DAYS #20 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court, having reviewed the parties Stipulation to Continue Motion to Dismiss Hearing Date By Twenty-One (21) days, HEREBY GRANTS the Application. January 31, 2023. at 10:00 a.m.: Hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Second Claim for Relief for Copyright Management Information Violations From Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (ECF 17). Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the Motion no later than January 5, 2023. Defendants shall file their reply in support of the Motion no later than January 17, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (rolm) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion filed by plaintiff Fashion Nova, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting request to continue hearing date 21 days and extend filing dates accordingly)(Olsen, John) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian J. Beck. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc., (Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Fashion Nova, LLC. (Olsen, John) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defedants Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc., Blush Mark, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by plaintiff Fashion Nova, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint)(Olsen, John) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Blush Mark Outfitters, Inc., Blush Mark, Inc.. (sh) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Olsen, John) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Olsen, John) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California limited liability company identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Olsen, John) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33890052 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney John F. Olsen added to party FASHION NOVA, LLC, a California limited liability company(pty:pla))(Olsen, John) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less