This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/30/2021 at 17:51:19 (UTC).

Farshid John Fakourfar v. Cedars-Sinai Health System et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 Farshid John Fakourfar filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Cedars-Sinai Health System. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07237

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farshid John Fakourfar

Torrance, CA 90503

Defendants

Cedars-Sinai Health System

Inglewood Imaging Center LLC

Designed Receivable Solutions Inc.

Business Revenue Systems Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Camarena

Attorney at North and Sedgwick Law

500 South Clinton No. 132

Chicago, IL 60607

Farshid John Fakourfar

Attorney at Law Office of Farshid John Fakourfar

3655 Torrance Boulevard Suite 335

Torrance, CA 90503

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Von Eschen

Attorney at The Maloney Firm APC

2381 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 405

El Segundo, CA 90245

Samantha A Botros

Attorney at The Maloney Firm APC

2381 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 405

El Segundo, CA 90245

Mackenzie Clara Gonzales

Attorney at Carlson and Messer LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

David J Kaminski

Attorney at Carlson and Messer LLP

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Designed Receivable Solutions Inc., (Kaminski, David) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#26

(#26) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with L.R 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Inglewood Imaging Center Only filed by Plaintiff Farshid John Fakourfar. (Camarena, Paul) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Designed Receivable Solutions Inc..(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Inglewood Imaging Center LLC answer now due 12/21/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Inglewood Imaging Center LLC.(Attorney Samantha A Botros added to party Inglewood Imaging Center LLC(pty:dft))(Botros, Samantha) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#22

(#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Designed Receivable Solutions Inc. answer now due 12/21/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Designed Receivable Solutions Inc..(Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Designed Receivable Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#21

(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Business Revenue Systems Inc. (iv) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Affidavit X]Certificate of Good Standing

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (et) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff pro se Farshid John Fakourfar. (Fakourfar, Farshid) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Designed Receivable Solutions Inc., (Kaminski, David) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Counsel must comply with L.R 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Inglewood Imaging Center Only filed by Plaintiff Farshid John Fakourfar. (Camarena, Paul) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Designed Receivable Solutions Inc..(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Inglewood Imaging Center LLC answer now due 12/21/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Inglewood Imaging Center LLC.(Attorney Samantha A Botros added to party Inglewood Imaging Center LLC(pty:dft))(Botros, Samantha) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Designed Receivable Solutions Inc. answer now due 12/21/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Designed Receivable Solutions Inc..(Attorney David J Kaminski added to party Designed Receivable Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Kaminski, David) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Business Revenue Systems Inc. (iv) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Inglewood Imaging Center LLC. (iv) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Designed Receivable Solutions Inc. (iv) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cedars-Sinai Health System. (iv) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Paul Camarena to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Farshid John Fakourfar, designating Farshid Fakourfar as local counsel #8 . (iv) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel is ordered to show cause in writing by September 28, 2021 why the Court should not impose sanctions in the amount of $750.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. (iv) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul Camarena to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Farshid John Fakourfar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32034817) filed by Plaintiff pro se Farshid John Fakourfar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit X]Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Fakourfar, Farshid) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (et) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff pro se Farshid John Fakourfar. (Fakourfar, Farshid) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: CCACDC-31952387 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff pro se Farshid John Fakourfar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Farshid John Fakourfar added to party Farshid John Fakourfar(pty:pla))(Fakourfar, Farshid) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Designed Receivable Solutions, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI HEALTH SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Von Eschen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David J Kaminski