Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 07:38:01 (UTC).

Farrow v. Norman et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 Farrow filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Norman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are M. Douglas Harpool and Prisoner Pro Se. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03264

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Douglas Harpool

Referral Judge

Prisoner Pro Se

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kurtis James Farrow

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Defendants

Jeff Norman

South Central Correctional Center

Daniel J. Ritter

Corizon Medical Services

Department of Corrections

Michele Buckner

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Further, the agency having custody of Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. Finally, Plaintiff is cautioned that federal law "makes prisoners responsible for appellate filing fees of $505.00 the moment the prisoner... files an appeal." (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER: ORDERED that this case is dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Further, the agency having custody of Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. Finally, Plaintiff is cautioned that federal law "makes prisoners responsible for appellate filing fees of $505.00 the moment the prisoner... files an appeal." Signed on September 12, 2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

(#15) PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT as directed by 8/30/19 order (Doc. #14 ) filed by Kurtis James Farrow. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#14

(#14) ORDER; ORDERED that (1) Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Doc. #11 ) is granted as set out below; (2) the Clerk of the Court send Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form; (3) using this form, and following all instructions on this form, Plaintiff file an amended complaint in which he lists as Defendants all of the individuals and entities he wishes to sue and describes briefly how each of these Defendants may have violated his rights under federal law; (4) Plaintiff shall file this amended complaint by September 13, 2019; (5) Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (Doc. #2 ) is denied without prejudice; and (6) Plaintiff's motions to compel and for subpoenas (Docs. #12 and #13 ) are denied without prejudice as premature. Signed on August 30, 2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (CLERK'S NOTE: 1983 forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#13

(#13) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for order for subpoenas filed by Kurtis James Farrow. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/28/2019. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

#12

(#12) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for an Order to Compel Defendant Corizon to provide copies of medical tests and to perform medical tests filed by Kurtis James Farrow. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2019. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#14) ORDER; ORDERED that (1) Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Doc. #11 ) is granted as set out below; (2) the Clerk of the Court send Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form; (3) using this form, and following all instructions on this form, Plaintiff file an amended complaint in which he lists as Defendants all of the individuals and entities he wishes to sue and describes briefly how each of these Defendants may have violated his rights under federal law; (4) Plaintiff shall file this amended complaint by September 13, 2019; (5) Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (Doc. #2 ) is denied without prejudice; and (6) Plaintiff's motions to compel and for subpoenas (Docs. #12 and #13 ) are denied without prejudice as premature. Signed on August 30, 2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (CLERK'S NOTE: 1983 forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

1 #11

Envelope

1 #10

Judge Assignment Label

1 #9

Original Filing Form

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Department of Corrections - Informal Resolution Requests

1 #6

Statement of Claim - Corizon Medical Services

1 #5

Statement of Claim - Department of Corrections

1 #4

Statement of Claim - South Central Correction Center

1 #3

Statement of Claim - Michele Buckner

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED that this case is dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Further, the agency having custody of Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. Finally, Plaintiff is cautioned that federal law "makes prisoners responsible for appellate filing fees of $505.00 the moment the prisoner... files an appeal." (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: ORDERED that this case is dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Further, the agency having custody of Plaintiff forward to the Clerk of the Court monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's account each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid. Finally, Plaintiff is cautioned that federal law "makes prisoners responsible for appellate filing fees of $505.00 the moment the prisoner... files an appeal." Signed on September 12, 2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT as directed by 8/30/19 order (Doc. #14 ) filed by Kurtis James Farrow. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits)(Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER; ORDERED that (1) Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint (Doc. #11 ) is granted as set out below; (2) the Clerk of the Court send Plaintiff a 42 U.S.C. 1983 complaint form; (3) using this form, and following all instructions on this form, Plaintiff file an amended complaint in which he lists as Defendants all of the individuals and entities he wishes to sue and describes briefly how each of these Defendants may have violated his rights under federal law; (4) Plaintiff shall file this amended complaint by September 13, 2019; (5) Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (Doc. #2 ) is denied without prejudice; and (6) Plaintiff's motions to compel and for subpoenas (Docs. #12 and #13 ) are denied without prejudice as premature. Signed on August 30, 2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (CLERK'S NOTE: 1983 forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for order for subpoenas filed by Kurtis James Farrow. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/28/2019. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for an Order to Compel Defendant Corizon to provide copies of medical tests and to perform medical tests filed by Kurtis James Farrow. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2019. (Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for leave to file an Amended Complaint filed by Kurtis James Farrow. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Willis, Kathy) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • RECEIPT number KCMO079014 in the amount of $1.50 issued to Missouri Department of Corrections on behalf of Kurtis James Farrow. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $1.50; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before August 6, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on July 23, 2019 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (Davies, Cindy) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-01716. (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Jun 21 11:27:35 CDT 2019 (Olliges, Chelsea) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Case to be transferred after 7/22/2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/21/2019. (CLO) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Jun 19 11:02:03 CDT 2019 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Kurtis James Farrow. (KKS) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Kurtis James Farrow. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff Kurtis James Farrow. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Kurtis James Farrow. (DJO) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DCM COMPLAINT against defendant Michele Buckner, Corizon Medical Services, Department of Corrections, Jeff Norman, Daniel J. Ritter, South Central Correctional Center Jury Demand,, filed by Kurtis James Farrow. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claim - Jeff Norman, #2 Statement of Claim - Daniel J. Ritter, #3 Statement of Claim - Michele Buckner, #4 Statement of Claim - South Central Correction Center, #5 Statement of Claim - Department of Corrections, #6 Statement of Claim - Corizon Medical Services, #7 Department of Corrections - Informal Resolution Requests, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Original Filing Form, #10 Judge Assignment Label, #11 Envelope)(DJO) [Transferred from moed on 7/23/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where South Central Correctional Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Corizon Medical is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant