This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2022 at 06:05:12 (UTC).

Farris v. AT&T Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Farris filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AT T Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory K Frizzell and Susan E Huntsman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Susan E Huntsman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bobbi Jo Farris

Defendant

AT&T Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel E Smolen

Attorney at Smolen and Roytman

701 S Cincinnati Ave

Tulsa, OK 74119

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Gary Rector

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC (Dallas)

2001 Ross Ave Ste 1500 Lb 116

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2021-03522 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2545270) by AT&T Corp. (With attachments) (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Gary Rector on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell staying case pending outcome of arbitration proceeding ; staying case; granting #11 Motion to Stay (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell staying case pending outcome of arbitration proceeding ; staying case; granting #11 Motion to Stay (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing AT&T Corp. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Relief from Local Counsel Requirement by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Gary Rector on behalf of AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by AT&T Corp. (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, Oklahoma, case number CJ-2021-03522 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2545270) by AT&T Corp. (With attachments) (Rector, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against AT&T Corp. by Bobbi Jo Farris (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Gary Rector