This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2019 at 07:50:29 (UTC).

Farrell v. Argon Medical Devices, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 Farrell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Argon Medical Devices, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00464

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B.P. Farrell

Defendant

Argon Medical Devices, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Kohlman Watsky

Attorney at Lyon, Gorsky, Gilbert & Livingston, L.L.P.

12001 North Central Expressway, Suite 650

Dallas, TX 75243

Defendant Attorneys

Gavin Samuel Martinson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - Dallas

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

Janet Landry Smith

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - Dallas

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Defendant's Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Argon Medical Devices, Inc..(Smith, Janet) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janet Landry Smith on behalf of Argon Medical Devices, Inc. (Smith, Janet) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/5/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#4

(#4) Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Argon Medical Devices, Inc..(Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by B.P. Farrell. Argon Medical Devices, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Watsky, David) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Argon Medical Devices, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Argon Medical Devices, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7322628.), filed by B P Farrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watsky, David) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Argon Medical Devices, Inc..(Smith, Janet) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Janet Landry Smith on behalf of Argon Medical Devices, Inc. (Smith, Janet) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/5/2019. (rpc, ) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Argon Medical Devices, Inc..(Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by B.P. Farrell. Argon Medical Devices, Inc. served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Watsky, David) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Argon Medical Devices, Inc. (rpc, ) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Argon Medical Devices, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7322628.), filed by B P Farrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watsky, David) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARGON MEDICAL DEVICES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janet Landry Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gavin S Martinson