This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 09:20:28 (UTC).

Farrell et al v. New Millennium Concepts, LTD

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Farrell filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against New Millennium Concepts, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Mendez and Jeremy D. Peterson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01691

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

Referral Judge

Jeremy D. Peterson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tara Farrell

Henly Velarde

Douglas Wells

Defendant

New Millennium Concepts, LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine A. Bruce

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Kelsey Elling

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Ryan Jack Clarkson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Shireen M. Clarkson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Yana A. Hart

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm PC

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Defendant Attorneys

Mark David Erickson

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

600 Anton Blvd., Ste. 700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Michelle C. Jacobs, PHV

Attorney at Haynes and Boone, LLP

2323 Victory Ave., Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant New Millennium Concepts, LTD. (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

12 #5

Proposed Order

12 #4

Exhibit 1-C

12 #3

Exhibit 1-B

12 #2

Exhibit 1-A

12 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shawn Elliott

12 #12

Main Document

11 #5

Proposed Order

11 #4

Exhibit 1-C

11 #3

Exhibit 1-B

11 #2

Exhibit 1-A

11 #1

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shawn Elliott

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/04/2021 GRANTING #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Michelle C. Jacobs, PHV for New Millennium Concepts, LTD. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. (Erickson, Mark) Modified on 11/4/2021 (Michel, G.). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#8

(#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by New Millennium Concepts, LTD for attorney Michelle C. Jacobs to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9912208) (Erickson, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant New Millennium Concepts, LTD. (Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to DISMISS by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shawn Elliott, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Shawn Elliott, #2 Exhibit 1-A, #3 Exhibit 1-B, #4 Exhibit 1-C, #5 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Michelle) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/04/2021 GRANTING #8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Michelle C. Jacobs, PHV for New Millennium Concepts, LTD. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Rodriguez, E) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. (Erickson, Mark) Modified on 11/4/2021 (Michel, G.). (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by New Millennium Concepts, LTD for attorney Michelle C. Jacobs to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9912208) (Erickson, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/2/2021 SUBSTITUTING Mark David Erickson for New Millennium Concepts, LTD in place of attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens. (Huang, H) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. (Erickson, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to respond to the #1 Complaint by New Millennium Concepts, LTD. Attorney Behrens, Richard Thaddeus ADDED. (Behrens, Richard) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: New Millennium Concepts, LTD served on 9/23/2021, answer due 10/14/2021. (Bruce, Katherine) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *New Millennium Concepts, LTD* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Katherine A. Bruce* *Clarkson Law Firm* *22525 Pacific Coast Highway* *Malibu, CA 90265*. (Huang, H) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against New Millennium Concepts, LTD by Tara Farrell, Henly Velarde, Douglas Wells. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9823341) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bruce, Katherine) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less