This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 07:36:29 (UTC).

Farnsworth v. Scottsdale Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 Farnsworth filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03828

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lowell Lynn Farnsworth

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian James Houghtaling

Attorney at Houghtaling Law Firm

3500 N Hullen St

Metairie, LA 70002

Defendant Attorneys

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Courtney Lehan Fournet

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Scottsdale Insurance Co answer due 12/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/17/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

6 #1

Proposed order

#6

(#6) MOTION to Expedite consideration of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

5 #1

Proposed order

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lowell Lynn Farnsworth. Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4878423) filed by Lowell Lynn Farnsworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Brian James Houghtaling added to party Lowell Lynn Farnsworth(pty:pla))(aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Scottsdale Insurance Co answer due 12/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/17/2021. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Motion to Expedite Consideration of the Motion for Extension. The extension is granted by separate, written order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/17/2021. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, #6 MOTION to Expedite. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Expedite consideration of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lowell Lynn Farnsworth. Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Scottsdale Insurance Company, requested by Lowell Lynn Farnsworth. (aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Scottsdale Insurance Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4878423) filed by Lowell Lynn Farnsworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Brian James Houghtaling added to party Lowell Lynn Farnsworth(pty:pla))(aty,Houghtaling, Brian) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant