This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2022 at 07:54:41 (UTC).

Farmington Casualty Company et al v. All County, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Farmington Casualty Company filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against All County, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rachel P. Kovner and Arlene R. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01067

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

Referral Judge

Arlene R. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Farmington Casualty Company

St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company

The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford Connecticut

The Charter Oak Fire Ins. Co.

The Phoenix Insurance Company

The Standard Fire Insurance Company

The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company

The Travelers Indemnity Company of America

The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut

Travelers Casualty & Surety Company

One Travelers Tower

Hartford, CT 06103

Travelers Casualty Company of Connecticut

Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company of America

The Travelers Indemnity Company

The Travelers Personal Security Insurance Company

Travelers Property Casualty Company of America

Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Travelers Personal Insurance Company

Defendants

All County, LLC

David R. Payne, M.D.

Jeffrey Byrne

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shaun M Malone

Attorney at Bruno Gerbino & Soriano, LLP

445 Broad Hollow Road, Suite 220

Melville, NY 11747

Vincent F. Gerbino

Attorney at Bruno, Gerbino & Soriano, LLP

445 Broad Hollow Road, Suite 420

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Affidavit of Service All County, LLC

5 #2

Affidavit of Service Allied Management Group, LLC

5 #3

Affidavit of Service MDHB Ventures, Inc.

5 #4

Affidavit of Service Jeffrey Byrnse

5 #5

Affidavit of Service Thomas Malillo

5 #6

Affidavit of Service David Payne, MD

5 #7

Affidavit of Service Georgia Malillo

5 #8

Affidavit of Service Robin Grossman

5 #9

Affidavit of Service Frank Monterisi

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farmington Casualty Company. All County, LLC served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022; Allied Management Group, LLC served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022; Jeffrey Byrne served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022; Robin Grossman served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022; MDHB Ventures, Inc. served on 3/10/2022, answer due 3/31/2022; Georgia Mallilo served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022; Thomas Mallilo served on 3/8/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service All County, LLC, #2 Affidavit of Service Allied Management Group, LLC, #3 Affidavit of Service MDHB Ventures, Inc., #4 Affidavit of Service Jeffrey Byrnse, #5 Affidavit of Service Thomas Malillo, #6 Affidavit of Service David Payne, MD, #7 Affidavit of Service Georgia Malillo, #8 Affidavit of Service Robin Grossman, #9 Affidavit of Service Frank Monterisi) (Malone, Shaun) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15328853 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Farmington Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Malone, Shaun) Modified on 3/1/2022 (Jakubowski, Laura). (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRAVELERS PERSONAL SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut is a litigant

Latest cases where Farmington Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Personal Insurance Company is a litigant