This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2021 at 08:12:29 (UTC).

Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Scott D. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00503

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

 

Party Details

Counter Defendants and Plaintiffs

Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC

Hardy Rice Dryer LLC

Counter Defendants, Defendants and Plaintiffs

Hardy Rice Dryer LLC

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

HDI Global Specialty SE

Old Republic Union Insurance

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

HUB International Limited

Robert Zetzmann

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

HDI Global Specialty SE

Old Republic Union Insurance

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.

Attorney at Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson- B.R.

P.O. Box 3197One American Place, 23Rd Floor

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3197

Candace B. Ford

Attorney at Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, LLP

301 Main Street23Rd Floor

70801, SU 1400

Carroll Devillier, Jr.

Attorney at Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, LLP

P. O. Box 3197

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cullen J. Dupuy

Attorney at Breazeale, Sachse & Wilson, LLP

P.O. Box 3197

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3197

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Streetsuite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

D. Russell Holwadel

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Streetsuite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Heather England Reznik, Femal

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydas Streetsuite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kyle Matthew Truxillo

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Streetste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Phillip J. Rew

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Streetsuite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard R. Stedman, II

Attorney at Hailey, Mcnamara, Hall, Larman, & Papale

One Galleria Boulevard, Suite 1400

Metairie, LA 70001

 

Court Documents

#12

#10

9 #1

proposed order

#9

8 #5

Exhibit 5

8 #3

Exhibit 3

#8

7 #1

Attachment

#7

6 #4

proposed order

6 #3

Exhibit 2

6 #2

Exhibit 1

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

5 #3

proposed order

5 #2

Exhibit 1

5 #1

Memorandum in Support

#5

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: The #7 Request for Oral Argument filed on October 8, 2021, by Plaintiffs Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, and Hardy Rice Dryer, LLC, is DENIED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be set by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER denying #9 Motion for Oral Argument. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be set by separate notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #7 MOTION for Oral Argument on #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION for Oral Argument on #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(6) and MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Oral Argument on #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(6) and MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Reynaud, Claude) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(6) and MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Rew, Phillip) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Oral Argument on #6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Oral Argument on #6 MOTION to Remand by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Reynaud, Claude) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 proposed order)(Reynaud, Claude) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(6) and, MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 proposed order)(Reynaud, Claude) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Rew, Phillip). Modified on 9/22/2021 to edit event and text (LLH). (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 11/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 9/2/2021. (KAH) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC by QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hoefer, Bruce) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number 708983. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2336524), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Pleadings)(Hoefer, Bruce) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HUB International LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant