This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/30/2019 at 07:44:06 (UTC).

Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa v. BASF Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against BASF Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and John A. Jarvey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00033

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

John A. Jarvey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa

Defendant

BASF Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin R. Merrill

Attorney at BROWN WINICK LAW FIRM

666 Grand Avenue, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309

Thomas D. Story

Attorney at BROWN WINICK LAW FIRM

666 Grand Avenue, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309

Brant D. Kahler

Attorney at BROWN WINICK LAW FIRM

666 Grand Avenue, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen R Eckley

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

Matthew David Callanan

Attorney at BELIN MCCORMICK, P.C.

666 Walnut Street, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309-3989

 

Court Documents

#1

#6

#7

#9

#10

#11

#13

#14

#16

#17

#18

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See order for particulars. Status Conference set for 7/23/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 9/26/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 11/25/2019 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 3/23/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 5/26/2020 10:30 AM in Phone Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2019. (imk) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2019. (imk) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER adopting #14 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 5/1/2019. Motions to Add Parties due by 5/21/2019. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/21/2019. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 6/21/2019. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/21/2019. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 9/23/2019. Discovery Deadline 1/21/2020. Dispositive Motion Deadline 2/21/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Bench Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Judge John A. Jarvey. Estimated length of five days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 3/26/2019. (imk) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#15) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Scheduling Conference held on 3/26/2019. Attorney Brant Kahler appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Stephen Eckley appeared for defendant. Status of case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 15 minutes. (imk) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Merrill, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION re #10 Answer to Complaint STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER WITHDRAWING JURY DEMAND by BASF Corporation. (Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • (#12) TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An In-Person Scheduling Conference shall be held on 3/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams in Room 420 at the Des Moines Courthouse. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided under L.R. 16 by 3/21/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/28/2019. (imk) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Callanan on behalf of BASF Corporation (Callanan, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint and Jury Demand by BASF Corporation.(Eckley, Stephen) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. (Kahler, Brant) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***See entry #6 for image***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. BASF Corporation served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. Refiled event to set Answer due deadline. (don) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COMPLAINT (Redacted) against BASF Corporation, filed by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 5/8/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 5/8/2019.(Kahler, Brant) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. (Kahler, Brant) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER: ORDER TO FILE REDACTED COMPLAINT. In addition to their sealed Complaint #3 , Plaintiff shall file an unsealed, redacted Complaint by 2/8/19. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 2/1/2019. (imk) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Initiating event not used to set deadlines. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 2/19/2019. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 4/29/2019. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 4/29/2019. (don) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (bp) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Sealed Document Complaint by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number IAS400020858 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Support Agreement)(Kahler, Brant) Modified on 1/31/2019, added payment information (kjw). (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) TEXT ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Plaintiff may file the Complaint and supporting attachments under seal. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 1/29/2019. (imk) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to File under Seal by Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa.Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 2/12/2019. (Kahler, Brant) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Chief Judge John A. Jarvey and Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams added. (kjw) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Farmers Mutual Hail Insurance Company of Iowa is a litigant

Latest cases where BASF Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen R. Eckley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew David Callanan