This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:21:23 (UTC).

Farm2Table, LLC v. Society Insurance

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Farm2Table, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Society Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00604

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Farm2Table, LLC doing business as Sea Salt

Defendant

Society Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirk Lee Clements

Attorney at Clements Law Firm, PLLC

105 Broadway, Suite 2

Nashville, TN 37201

Defendant Attorneys

E. Jason Ferrell

Attorney at Brewer, Krause, Brooks & Chastain, PLLC

545 Mainstream Drive, Suite 101

Nashville, TN 37228

Curtis L. Campbell

Attorney at Brewer, Krause, Brooks & Chastain, PLLC

545 Mainstream Drive, Suite 101

Nashville, TN 37228

Parks T. Chastain

Attorney at Brewer, Krause, Brooks & Chastain, PLLC

545 Mainstream Drive, Suite 101

Nashville, TN 37228

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for 9/14/2020 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/2020. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#16

(#16) REPLY to Response to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement to file additional pages for reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2020. (vh) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; 29-page brief allowed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2020. (jw) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint. Extension to 8/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2020. (dt) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint Unopposed by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

7 #6

Exhibit F - Executive Order No. 27

7 #5

Exhibit E - Order 3 from Chief Med Director

7 #4

Exhibit D - Amended and Restated Order 1 Chief Med Director

7 #3

Exhibit C - Executive Order No. 22

7 #2

Exhibit B - Executive Order No. 21

7 #1

Exhibit A - Executive Order No. 17

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Society Insurance . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executive Order No. 17, #2 Exhibit B - Executive Order No. 21, #3 Exhibit C - Executive Order No. 22, #4 Exhibit D - Amended and Restated Order 1 Chief Med Director, #5 Exhibit E - Order 3 from Chief Med Director, #6 Exhibit F - Executive Order No. 27)(Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Dismiss #6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for 9/14/2020 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/9/2020. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement to file additional pages for reply. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2020. (vh) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; 29-page brief allowed. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/12/2020. (jw) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint. Extension to 8/10/2020. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/5/2020. (dt) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint Unopposed by Farm2Table, LLC. (Clements, Kirk) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Kirk Lee Clements, E. Jason Ferrell, Curtis L. Campbell, Parks T. Chastain. (dt) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 at 3:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint filed by Society Insurance . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executive Order No. 17, #2 Exhibit B - Executive Order No. 21, #3 Exhibit C - Executive Order No. 22, #4 Exhibit D - Amended and Restated Order 1 Chief Med Director, #5 Exhibit E - Order 3 from Chief Med Director, #6 Exhibit F - Executive Order No. 27)(Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Complaint by Society Insurance. (Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Curtis L. Campbell. (dt) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis L. Campbell on behalf of Society Insurance (Campbell, Curtis) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Society Insurance. (dt) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Society Insurance from Circuit Court for Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 20C1320. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0650-3177285) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit A to State Court Complaint, #3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less