This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2020 at 07:38:28 (UTC).

Farley v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 Farley filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory B. Wormuth and Kea W. Riggs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

Presiding Judge

Kea W. Riggs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Troy Farley

Defendants

Andrew Saul

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Eilers Decker

Attorney at Decker Law Office, LLC

Po Box 92740

Albuquerque, NM 87199

Defendant Attorneys

Manuel Lucero

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

Po Box 607

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Jennifer Ann Randall

Attorney at SSA

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. (cmm) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Randall on behalf of Social Security Administration (Randall, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 4 and 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge by District Judge Kea W. Riggs. (cmm) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#6) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs and Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Lucero on behalf of Social Security Administration (Lucero, Manuel) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (aek) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (aek) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6888075 re 1 Complaint filed by Troy Farley (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Decker, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less