This case was last updated from PACER on 02/14/2021 at 11:28:21 (UTC).

Farley v. Lincoln Benefit Life Co.

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 Farley filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Lincoln Benefit Life Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02485

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deana Farley

Defendant

Lincoln Benefit Life Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig M. Nicholas

Attorney at Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP

225 Broadway, 19Th Floor

San Diego, CA 92101

Jack B. Winters, Jr.

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Blvd.

La Mesa, CA 91942

Georg Michael Capielo

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Blvd.

La Mesa, CA 91942

Sarah Dale Ball

Attorney at Winters & Associates

8489 La Mesa Blvd.

La Mesa, CA 91942

Defendant Attorney

Tarifa Belle Laddon

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#10

(#10) MOTION to DISMISS by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Laddon, Tarifa) Modified on 2/8/2021 (Tupolo, A). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. Attorney Laddon, Tarifa Belle added. (Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lincoln Benefit Life Company served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

6 #3

VDRP

6 #1

Standing Order

#6

(#6) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lincoln Benefit Life Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig M. Nicholas* *Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP* *225 Broadway, 19th Floor* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

4 #1

Proof of Service Proof of Service

#4

(#4) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Georg Michael Capielo on behalf of Deana Farley. Attorney Capielo, Georg Michael added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Capielo, Georg) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

3 #1

Proof of Service

#3

(#3) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sarah Dale Ball on behalf of Deana Farley. Attorney Ball, Sarah Dale added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ball, Sarah) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

2 #1

Proof of Service

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/9/2021: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 4/22/2021 is ADVANCED to 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. The March Hearing will proceed by video conferencing through the Zoom application. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the hearing access information no less than 24 hours before the hearing. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to DISMISS by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. Motion Hearing set for 3/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Laddon, Tarifa) Modified on 2/8/2021 (Tupolo, A). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/7/2021: The court is in receipt of the parties' Stipulation to Extend Time by which Defendant Lincoln Benefit Life Company must respond to the Complaint by thirty days. ECF No. #8 . An initial stipulation to continue a deadline by longer than twenty-eight days must be approved by the court. See E.D. Cal. L.R. 144(a). The court therefore approves the stipulation. Lincoln's deadline to respond to the Complaint, ECF No. #1 , is 2/8/2021. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Lincoln Benefit Life Company. Attorney Laddon, Tarifa Belle added. (Laddon, Tarifa) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Lincoln Benefit Life Company served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Lincoln Benefit Life Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig M. Nicholas* *Nicholas & Tomasevic, LLP* *225 Broadway, 19th Floor* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Georg Michael Capielo on behalf of Deana Farley. Attorney Capielo, Georg Michael added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Capielo, Georg) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sarah Dale Ball on behalf of Deana Farley. Attorney Ball, Sarah Dale added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ball, Sarah) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jack B. Winters, Jr on behalf of Deana Farley. Attorney Winters, Jack B. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Winters, Jack) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lincoln Benefit Life Company by Deana Farley. Attorney Nicholas, Craig M. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9307252) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nicholas, Craig) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Dale Ball

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Georg Michael Capielo