This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/18/2022 at 07:17:29 (UTC).

Faris v. Centers for Disease Control & Prevention et al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 Faris filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Centers for Disease Control Prevention. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin Beaton and Regina S. Edwards. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00023

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin Beaton

Referral Judge

Regina S. Edwards

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Faris

Elizabethtown, KY 42701

Defendants

Centers for Disease Control & Prevention

Department of Health & Human Services

American Airlines

JetBlue Airways

Southwest Airlines

Spirit Airlines

United Airlines

Numerous Yet-to-be-Named Employees of the 5 Airlines

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Freidah

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L Street Nw, Ste 12308

Washington, DC 20005

Stephen Michael Pezzi

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Michael J. Gerardi

Attorney at Department of Justice

1100 L St. Nw, Room 12212

Washington, DC 20530

Carol D. Browning

Attorney at Stites & Harbison, PLLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 1800

Louisville, KY 40202-3352

Milton Roy Goldberg

Attorney at Stinson LLP - Washington

1775 Pennsylvania Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

69 #1

Ex. 1 - Order Denying PI Motion in Wall v CDC (M.D. Fla.)

69 #69

Main Document

#68

(#68) Proposed Order by American Airlines, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Spirit Airlines, United Airlines. (Browning, Carol) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

67 #1

Proposed Order

67 #67

Main Document

65 #4

Proposed Order

65 #3

Exhibit 3

65 #2

Exhibit 2

65 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #28

Exhibit 54

1 #25

Exhibit 51

1 #22

Exhibit 22

1 #17

Exhibit 17

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #1

Main Document

217 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Order Denying PI Motion in Wall v CDC (M.D. Fla.)) (Pezzi, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Proposed Order by American Airlines, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Spirit Airlines, United Airlines. (Browning, Carol) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) RESPONSE to Motion re #65 MOTION to Add 15 Additional Defendants filed by American Airlines, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Spirit Airlines, United Airlines. (Browning, Carol) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/15/2022: #1 Proposed Order) (DeW). (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (JM) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) MOTION to Add 15 Additional Defendants by Plaintiff Michael Faris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order) (JM) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (JM) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) RESPONSE re #59 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by American Airlines, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Spirit Airlines, United Airlines. (Browning, Carol) Modified link and docket text on 3/9/2022 (JM). (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Gerardi on behalf of Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services (Gerardi, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) REPLY re #23 MOTION to Transfer Case , #25 MOTION to Transfer Case , #21 MOTION to Transfer Case Airline Defendants' Reply Brief ISO Motion to Transfer Litigation to the Middle District of Florida filed by American Airlines, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Spirit Airlines, United Airlines. (Browning, Carol) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Plaintiff Michael Faris (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (JM) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summonses Issued as to American Airlines, Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Spirit Airlines, United Airlines. Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). cc: Plaintiff, pro-se (DeW) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING tendered Summonses by Michael Faris re #7 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DeW) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (DeW) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (DeW) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTACHMENT(s) re #1 Complaint by Michael Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 232-234) (DeW) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTACHMENT(s) re #1 Complaint by Michael Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 176-200, #2 Exhibit 201-221, #3 Exhibit 220-229) (DeW) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTACHMENT(s) re #1 Complaint by Michael Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 98, #2 Exhibit 99, #3 Exhibit 100, #4 Exhibit 101-120, #5 Exhibit 121-130, #6 Exhibit 131-150) (DeW) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTACHMENT(s) re #1 Complaint by Michael Faris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 68, #2 Exhibit 69, #3 Exhibit 70, #4 Exhibit 71, #5 Exhibit 72, #6 Exhibit 73, #7 Exhibit 74, #8 Exhibit 75, #9 Exhibit 76, #10 Exhibit 77, #11 Exhibit 78, #12 Exhibit 79, #13 Exhibit 80, #14 Exhibit 81, #15 Exhibit 82, #16 Exhibit 83, #17 Exhibit 84, #18 Exhibit 85, #19 Exhibit 86, #20 Exhibit 87, #21 Exhibit 88, #22 Exhibit 89, #23 Exhibit 90, #24 Exhibit 91, #25 Exhibit 92, #26 Exhibit 93, #27 Exhibit 94, #28 Exhibit 95, #29 Exhibit 96) (DeW) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Michael Faris against Centers for Disease Control & Prevention, Department of Health & Human Services, American Airlines, JetBlue Airways, Southwest Airlines, Spirit Airlines, United Airlines, Numerous Yet-to-be-Named Employees of the 5 Airlines. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number L33069167.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24-50 - Blank, #25 Exhibit 51, #26 Exhibit 52, #27 Exhibit 53, #28 Exhibit 54, #29 Exhibit 55, #30 Exhibit 56, #31 Exhibit 57, #32 Exhibit 58, #33 Exhibit 59, #34 Exhibit 60, #35 Exhibit 61, #36 Exhibit 62, #37 Exhibit 63, #38 Exhibit 64, #39 Exhibit 65, #40 Exhibit 66) (DeW) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPIRIT AIRLINES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Health and Human Services, Division Children Family Services, also known as D.H.H.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant