This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2021 at 11:02:13 (UTC).

Farid v. Chicago Police Department et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 Farid filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Chicago Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04767

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laila Farid

Chicago, IL 60630

Defendants

Chicago Police Department

City of Chicago Law Dept

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#8

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone motion hearing held on 9/24/2021. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 are taken under advisement. The Court will review the complaint to see if it is appropriate. Plaintiff is referred to make an appointment at the Hibbler Help Desk by calling 312-435-5691 or by emailing hibbler@legalaidchicago.org. Telephone status hearing is set for 10/5/2021 at 10:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court directs pro se plaintiff to file her EEOC charge with the Court. The Court already has pro se plaintiff's August 10, 2021 right to sue letter and November 2, 2020 Illinois Department of Human Rights letter, but also needs the EEOC charge referenced in the November 2, 2020 letter. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing set for 10/5/2021 is stricken and reset to 10/19/2021 at 10:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff must file her EEOC charge with the Court by no later than 10/18/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#13

(#13) EEOC CHARGE filling with court by Laila Farid (Exhibits) (exr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court denies without prejudice pro se plaintiff Laila Farid's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . Plaintiff must pay the $402 filing fee or file an amended in forma pauperis motion by 11/5/2021 or her case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b). The current in forma pauperis motion is incomplete. In her amended in forma pauperis motion, plaintiff must answer each question truthfully and provide a complete and accurate picture of her financial circumstances. The Court directs plaintiff's attention to the Hibbler pro se assistance help desk at hibbler@legalaidchicago.org. Telephone status hearing set for 10/19/2021 is stricken. The Court will set a status at a later date. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

#16

(#16) ENTERED IN ERROR (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Correction regarding #16 (exr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#18

(#18) COMPLAINT filed by Laila Farid (Exhibits) (exr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#19

(#19) STATEMENT by Laila Farid (exr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#20

(#20) ORDER: Plaintiff is to have the Clerk's Office issue summons for service by the U.S. Marshal Service. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons. Plaintiff shall complete a USM-285 form for each defendant being served if she has not done so. The Court will set a hearing once service is executed. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/5/2021. Mailed notice. (exr, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued along with USM 285 form(s), certified copy of order dated 11/5/2021 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendants Chicago Police Department, City of Chicago Law Dept via email (exr, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: Plaintiff is to have the Clerk's Office issue summons for service by the U.S. Marshal Service. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons. Plaintiff shall complete a USM-285 form for each defendant being served if she has not done so. The Court will set a hearing once service is executed. Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/5/2021. Mailed notice. (exr, ) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STATEMENT by Laila Farid (exr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) COMPLAINT filed by Laila Farid (Exhibits) (exr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Correction regarding #16 (exr, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ENTERED IN ERROR (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court denies without prejudice pro se plaintiff Laila Farid's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . Plaintiff must pay the $402 filing fee or file an amended in forma pauperis motion by 11/5/2021 or her case will be dismissed for want of prosecution. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b). The current in forma pauperis motion is incomplete. In her amended in forma pauperis motion, plaintiff must answer each question truthfully and provide a complete and accurate picture of her financial circumstances. The Court directs plaintiff's attention to the Hibbler pro se assistance help desk at hibbler@legalaidchicago.org. Telephone status hearing set for 10/19/2021 is stricken. The Court will set a status at a later date. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EEOC CHARGE filling with court by Laila Farid (Exhibits) (exr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff must file her EEOC charge with the Court by no later than 10/18/2021. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone status hearing set for 10/5/2021 is stricken and reset to 10/19/2021 at 10:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court directs pro se plaintiff to file her EEOC charge with the Court. The Court already has pro se plaintiff's August 10, 2021 right to sue letter and November 2, 2020 Illinois Department of Human Rights letter, but also needs the EEOC charge referenced in the November 2, 2020 letter. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Telephone motion hearing held on 9/24/2021. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 are taken under advisement. The Court will review the complaint to see if it is appropriate. Plaintiff is referred to make an appointment at the Hibbler Help Desk by calling 312-435-5691 or by emailing hibbler@legalaidchicago.org. Telephone status hearing is set for 10/5/2021 at 10:45 AM. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Presentment of plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 is set for 9/24/2021 at 10:15 AM by telephone conference. The call-in number is (877)336-1829 and the access code is 5205245. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Plaintiff Laila Farid for attorney representation (exr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Laila Farid for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (exr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Laila Farid (exr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (exr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Laila Farid (Exhibits) (exr, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chicago Police Department is a litigant