This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2023 at 07:02:30 (UTC).

Fannett-Metal School District v. Altria Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2023 Fannett-Metal School District filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Altria Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher C. Conner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00220

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fannett-Metal School District

Defendants

Altria Group, Inc.

Altria Client Services

Altria Group Distribution Company

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

John Does 1-100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Frantz

Michael D. Shakley

Thomas Eric Breth

Thomas W. King, III

William Shinoff

Jordan P. Shuber

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6190722), filed by Fannett-Metal School District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Praecipe To Issue Summons, filed by Fannett-Metal School District. (Attachments: #1 Altria Group, Inc., #2 Altria Client Services, #3 Altria Distribution Company, #4 Philip Morris USA, Inc.)(ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

2 #1

Altria Group, Inc.

2 #2

Altria Client Services

2 #3

Altria Distribution Company

2 #4

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

#3

(#3) Summons Packet Second Amended Case Management Order No. 3 by Fannett-Metal School District.. (ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

4 #1

Summons Packet

#5

(#5) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/7/2023. (mw) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fannett-Metal School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(King, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

6 #1

Exhibit(s)

#7

(#7) CTO Stay is lifted pending any opposition within seven days.. (mw) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail doc #8 sent to Atty James Frantz :return to sender" (sm) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail doc #8 sent to Atty William Shinoff "return to sender" (sm) (Entered: 04/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Middle has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:23-cv-01344, filed 03/23/2023. (jw) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order transferring case to Northern District of California (MDL No. 2913) per Certified CTO-99. (mw) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CTO Stay is lifted pending any opposition within seven days.. (mw) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fannett-Metal School District (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(King, Thomas) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 2/7/2023. (mw) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Special Admissions form for Michael Shakley, James Frantz and William Shinoff can be obtained at https://www.pamd.uscourts.gov/forms/petition-admission-practice (ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Packet Second Amended Case Management Order No. 3 by Fannett-Metal School District.. (ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Praecipe To Issue Summons, filed by Fannett-Metal School District. (Attachments: #1 Altria Group, Inc., #2 Altria Client Services, #3 Altria Distribution Company, #4 Philip Morris USA, Inc.)(ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6190722), filed by Fannett-Metal School District. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ll) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less