This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2020 at 08:58:36 (UTC).

Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC v. Goodman et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Goodman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and P. Bradley Murray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00369

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

P. Bradley Murray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC

Defendants

ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America

Stewart Goodman

Ads for Academics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Carroll

Attorney at Johnstone Carroll LLC

2204 Lakeshore Drive, Suite 303

Homewood, AL 35209

James H. McFerrin

Attorney at The McFerrin Law Firm

3117 Manitou Lane

Birmingham, AL 35216

Defendant Attorney

Nicole Strickler

Attorney at Messer Strickler Ltd

225 W Washington, Suite 575

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER, GRANTING #7 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Nicole Marie Strickler. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/9/2020. (mab) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Stewart Goodman. (Strickler, Nicole) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION and APPLICATION for Nicole M. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2671843, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ads for Academics, Inc., Stewart Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Strickler, Nicole) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. Ads for Academics, Inc. waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Goodman, Stewart on 8/10/2020, filed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#3

(#3) Summonses Issued as to Ads for Academics, Inc., Stewart Goodman, ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2649086, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendant Stewart Goodman's #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading is due no later than October 23, 2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/9/2020. (mab) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER, GRANTING #7 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Nicole Marie Strickler. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/9/2020. (mab) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint to Judge Moorer. (tot) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Stewart Goodman. (Strickler, Nicole) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Nicole M. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (tot) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION and APPLICATION for Nicole M. Strickler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2671843, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ads for Academics, Inc., Stewart Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Strickler, Nicole) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. Ads for Academics, Inc. waiver sent on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer due from Stewart Goodman pursuant to FRCP 12(a) - See Doc. #5 . (tot) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Goodman, Stewart on 8/10/2020, filed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America waiver sent on 8/7/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summonses Issued as to Ads for Academics, Inc., Stewart Goodman, ManhattanLife Assurance Company of America. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2649086, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Family Medicine Pharmacy, LLC. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 10/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Carroll, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less