This case was last updated from PACER on 11/28/2020 at 09:38:10 (UTC).

FALOON v. BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 FALOON filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against BOUCHARD CLEANING RESTORATION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III, JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR and NANCY TORRESEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00353

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judges

JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR

NANCY TORRESEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD FALOON

Defendant

BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN P. GAUSE

Attorney at EASTERN MAINE LAW LLC

23 Water Street, Suite 202

Bangor, ME 04401

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAM J. WAHRER

Attorney at BERNSTEIN SHUR

100 Middle Street, West Tower, P.O. Box 9729

Portland, ME 04104-5029

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN for all further proceedings By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. WAHRER on behalf of BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC (WAHRER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC waiver sent on 9/30/2020. (GAUSE, JOHN) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by RICHARD FALOON. (Service of Process Deadline 12/28/2020) Fee due by 10/1/2020.(bfa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due from BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC by 11/30/2020. (mnd) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN for all further proceedings By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (tcs) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM J. WAHRER on behalf of BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC (WAHRER, WILLIAM) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC : Answer due by 11/30/2020. (tcs) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC waiver sent on 9/30/2020. (GAUSE, JOHN) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AMEDC-2329246.), filed by RICHARD FALOON.(GAUSE, JOHN) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BOUCHARD CLEANING & RESTORATION INC with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by RICHARD FALOON. (Service of Process Deadline 12/28/2020) Fee due by 10/1/2020.(bfa) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less