This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:57:27 (UTC).

FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC v. CITIBANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by FALONI ASSOCIATES, LLC against CITIBANK, N A in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04195

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendants

Citibank N.A.

CITIMORTGAGE

CITIFINANCIAL

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITIBANK, N.A. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-1802-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9571346), filed by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Notice of Removal to All Adverse Parties)(SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/10/2019)

1 #1

Certificate of Service Notice of Removal to All Adverse Parties

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIBANK, N.A. identifying Citigroup, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

3 #1

Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff&

#3

(#4) CONSENT ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Letter with Proposed Order. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be and the same is hereby extended until and including 5/16/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/11/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#4

(#4) CONSENT ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Letter with Proposed Order. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be and the same is hereby extended until and including 5/16/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/11/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES SHORTT on behalf of CITIBANK, N.A. (SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Pl

#6

(#7) CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re #6 Defendant's Letter with Text of Proposed Order. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 6/17/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/7/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#62

(#62) ORDER granting #61 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/30/2020. (SLT) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#61

(#61) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#60

(#60) ORDER granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A. Faloni, Jr. for FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/22/2020. (CLR) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#59

(#59) MOTION for Attorney David A. Faloni, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3241359) by FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#58

(#58) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Williams on behalf of FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

57 #5

Exhibit Stipulation and Consent

57 #3

Exhibit Consent Order - Citibank NA

57 #4

Exhibit Consent Order - Faloni and Assoc

57 #1

Exhibit 2013 Agreement

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) ORDER granting #61 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/30/2020. (SLT) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#61) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#60) ORDER granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David A. Faloni, Jr. for FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 1/22/2020. (CLR) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#59) MOTION for Attorney David A. Faloni, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3241359) by FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Williams on behalf of FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Williams, Richard) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#57) DECLARATION in Support re #55 MOTION to DISMISS of Christopher Comstock filed by Citibank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2013 Agreement, #2 Exhibit Consent Judgment - Citibank, #3 Exhibit Consent Order - Citibank NA, #4 Exhibit Consent Order - Faloni and Assoc, #5 Exhibit Stipulation and Consent, #6 Exhibit March 18, 2014 final report) (Brost, Ashley) Modified Docket Text on 1/22/2020 (DLC). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#56) MEMORANDUM in Support re #55 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#55) MOTION to DISMISS by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER granting #53 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines Set a Date for Defendant Citibank, N.A. to File Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 12/30/2019. (CLR) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines Set a Date for Defendant Citibank, N.A. to File Motion to Dismiss by Citibank N.A.. (Brost, Ashley) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. FALONI, JR on behalf of FALONI & ASSOCIATES, LLC (FALONI, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT re #6 Defendant's Letter with Text of Proposed Order. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended until 6/17/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/7/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Marc C. Singer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES SHORTT on behalf of CITIBANK, N.A. (SHORTT, MICHAEL) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT ORDER granting #3 Defendant's Letter with Proposed Order. The time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be and the same is hereby extended until and including 5/16/2019. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/11/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Marc C. Signer. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIBANK, N.A. identifying Citigroup, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CITIBANK, N.A. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Essex County, case number ESX-L-1802-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9571346), filed by CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Notice of Removal to All Adverse Parties)(SINGER, MARC) [Transferred from New Jersey on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.