This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2019 at 09:09:22 (UTC).

Fallis v. County of Minnehaha et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Fallis filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against County of Minnehaha. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberto A. Lange. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04159

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roberto A. Lange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Loren Fallis

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Defendants

County of Minnehaha

Tracy Smith

State of South Dakota

Mike Miller

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Loren Fallis. (CLR) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

#3

(#3) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (SLT) Modified event on 11/1/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand filed by Loren Fallis. (CLR) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PRISONER Trust Account Report. (CLR) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of Loren Fallis. (CLR) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (SLT) Modified event on 11/1/2019 (DJP). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated). Copy of docket sheet, Application to Proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (CLR) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand filed by Loren Fallis. (CLR) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less