This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2020 at 09:53:11 (UTC).

Falgout v. Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Falgout filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-03035

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mathew Falgout

Defendant

Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa Leila Louzri

Attorney at Foster Law Firm

Po Box 2123

Greenville, SC 29602

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua Wallace Dixon

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Victoria Therese Kepes

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 SEALED MOTION Response filed by Mathew Falgout.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/14/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

13 #2

Memo in Support

13 #1

Exhibit A - Non-Confidential Index of Documents to be Sealed

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION to Seal by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non-Confidential Index of Documents to be Sealed, #2 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua) Modified to edit text on 9/21/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 09/21/2020)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 10/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#7

(#7) REPLY by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. to 4 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#6

(#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mathew Falgout.(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.(cbru, ) Modified to correct filing date on 8/25/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lancaster County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-29-00948 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9297476) filed by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2020: #2 Certificate of Service) (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 SEALED MOTION Response filed by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.. (Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 SEALED MOTION Response filed by Mathew Falgout.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/14/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SEALED MOTION by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 10/8/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Conejo, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Keibler)No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua) (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/25/2020) (cbru, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/25/2020) (cbru, ). (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Seal. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/24/2020.(cbru, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION to Seal by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non-Confidential Index of Documents to be Sealed, #2 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Dixon, Joshua) Modified to edit text on 9/21/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. answer due 10/21/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/21/2020.(cbru, ) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 10/5/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. answer due 9/21/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/31/2020.(cbru, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. to 4 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Dixon, Joshua) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Mathew Falgout.(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 9/1/2020) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/25/2020. (cbru, ) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc.(cbru, ) Modified to correct filing date on 8/25/2020 (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lancaster County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-29-00948 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9297476) filed by Coventry Healthcare of the Carolinas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(cbru, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2020: #2 Certificate of Service) (cbru, ). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victoria Therese Kepes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Wallace Dixon