This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:35:07 (UTC).

Falgout et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 Falgout filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ronald Falgout

Chad Falgout

Defendants

Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

ABC Company

K&B Louisiana Corporation

XYZ Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Michael Galante

Attorney at Galante & Bivalacqua

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Christopher Joseph Fransen

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lindsey A Cheek

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Damon R. Pourciau

Attorney at Pourciau Law Firm

2200 Veterans Memorial Blvd, Suite 210

Kenner, LA 70062

Jeanne Louise St. Romain

Attorney at Morris Bart, LLC

601 Poydras St., 24Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Leila A. D'Aquin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3200

New Orleans, LA 70163-3200

Claire A. Noonan

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

John W. Sinnott

Attorney at Irwin, Fritchie, Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Carlos A Benach

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kim E. Moore

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Meera Unnithan Sossamon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lambert J. Hassinger, Jr.

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith- N.O.

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4040

New Orleans, LA 70139

Jeffrey J Siemann

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith- N.O.

701 Poydras St., 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

Jonathan D Lewis

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4040

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

17 #3

Exhibit C

17 #2

Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #8 Motion to Remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

16 #6

Exhibit

16 #5

Exhibit

16 #4

Exhibit

16 #2

Exhibit

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(ELW) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#2

(#2) Letter to Attorney Lindsey A. Cheek regarding Rubi L. Brown who is Co-Counsel for party Ronald Falgout and Chad Falgout. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit B -- Part 4

1 #4

Exhibit B -- Part 3

1 #3

Exhibit B -- Part 2

1 #2

Exhibit B -- Part 1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Certified State Court Record

#1

MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #8 Motion to Remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) Modified on 6/27/2019 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(ELW) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #14 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 14-1 through 14-7 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/14/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 2 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 3 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit 4 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit 5 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit 6 to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 6/13/2019 to create a relationship (LT). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORANDUM in Support of #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout. (SWE) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER denying #10 Motion for Oral Argument on #8 Emergency Motion to Remand. If the Court determines that oral argument will assist in resolution of the Emergency Motion to Remand, the Court will order oral argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting for good cause the #9 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand. The clerk of court is directed to file R. Doc. 9-1 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Oral Argument on #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand , #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand , #9 MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Oral Argument on #8 Emergency MOTION to Remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to File Memo in Support of Motion to remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Emergency MOTION to Remand by Chad Falgout, Ronald Falgout. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D1, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and by Johnson & Johnson.(Sossamon, Meera) Modified on 5/21/2019 to edit docket text (KMW). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Benach, Carlos) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Johnson & Johnson answer due 5/21/2019; Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. answer due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/30/2019. (ELW) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to Attorney Lindsey A. Cheek regarding Rubi L. Brown who is Co-Counsel for party Ronald Falgout and Chad Falgout. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number C-6760243. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1931437), filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B -- Part 1, #3 Exhibit B -- Part 2, #4 Exhibit B -- Part 3, #5 Exhibit B -- Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.