This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2021 at 08:45:36 (UTC).

Falcone v. Anco Insulations, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Falcone filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Anco Insulations, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nannette Jolivette Brown and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00233

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nannette Jolivette Brown

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry Nuncio Falcone

Defendants

Foster Wheeler LLC

Viking Pump, Inc.

Grefco, Inc.

Bollinger Marine Fabricators, L.L.C.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Anadarko US Offshore, LLC

Callon Petroleum Company

Goulds Pumps

The McCarty Corporation

Crane Co.

Anco Insulations Inc

SSX, L.C.

John Crane Inc

ViacomCBS Inc

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

ConocoPhillips Company

BP Corporation North America, Inc.

General Electric Company

United Bulk Terminals Davant, L.L.C.

66 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Michael Galante

Attorney at Galante & Bivalacqua LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

James Matthew Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Deborah DeRoche Kuchler

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Perrey S. Lee

Attorney at Kuchler Polk Weiner, LLC (New Orleans)

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70112

Douglas R. Elliott

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux

Attorney at Manning Gross Massenburg

365 Canal Street, Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Christopher O. Massenburg

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Other Attorneys

John Allain Viator

Attorney at Bienvenu, Bonnecaze, Foco & Viator, LLC

4210 Bluebonnet Blvd.

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Amber L. Stewart

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe APLC

1515 Poydras St., Ste 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Cynthia Cleland Roth

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Patrick R Follette

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Brady McNeil Hadden

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Daniel Edwin Buras, Jr.

Attorney at Chehardy,Sherman,Williams,Murray,Recile,Stakelum&Hayes, LLC

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1100

Metairie, LA 70001

Douglas Watson Redfearn

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Robert T. Vorhoff

909 Poydras St, Suite 1800

New Orleans, LA 70112

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Thomas A. Porteous

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Edward B. Poitevent, II

Attorney at Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann, LLC (New Orleans)

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3150

New Orleans, LA 70112-4042

106 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#78

(#78) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. (Sweeney, Craig) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (jls). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#77

(#77) ORDER that Defendant, Anadarko US Offshore LLCs, Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement is DENIED AS MOOT, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/31/2021. (caa) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#76

(#76) ORDER GRANTING #74 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel. Robert T. Vorhoff is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record and Paul D. Palermo, Cynthia Cleland Roth, and Craig V. Sweeney is hereby ENROLLED as counsel of record for Defendant Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/30/2021. (jls) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

75 #1

Proposed Order

#75

(#75) EXPARTE/CONSENT Stipulation and MOTION for Proposed Consent Order by and Between Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone, and Defendant, Anadarko US Offshore, LLC regarding Anadarko's Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement, rec. doc. 56, by Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone, and by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Michael North.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ziffer, Lee) Modified text/removed referral on 3/30/2021 (jls). Referred on 3/31/2021 (jls). (Entered: 03/29/2021)

74 #1

Proposed Order

#74

(#74) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul D. Palermo, Craig V. Sweeney, and Cynthia C. Roth to be substituted in place of Robert Vorhoff by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vorhoff, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#73

(#73) DEFICIENT. STIPULATION by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC re 69 Order on Motion for More Definite Statement, 58 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk, and filed by Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone (Ziffer, Lee) Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm). Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#72

(#72) DEFICIENT. ANSWER to 1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. (Sweeney, Craig) Modified text on 3/24/2021 (bm). Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

1 #12

Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties

1 #11

Notice of Removal to State Court

1 #10

Exhibit E Part 5 of 5

1 #9

Exhibit E Part 4 of 5

1 #8

Exhibit E Part 3 of 5

1 #7

Exhibit E Part 2 of 5

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

#1

(#78) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. (Sweeney, Craig) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (jls). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. (Sweeney, Craig) Modified text on 4/2/2021 (jls). (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER that Defendant, Anadarko US Offshore LLCs, Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement is DENIED AS MOOT, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/31/2021. (caa) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ORDER GRANTING #74 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel. Robert T. Vorhoff is hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel of record and Paul D. Palermo, Cynthia Cleland Roth, and Craig V. Sweeney is hereby ENROLLED as counsel of record for Defendant Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/30/2021. (jls) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) EXPARTE/CONSENT Stipulation and MOTION for Proposed Consent Order by and Between Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone, and Defendant, Anadarko US Offshore, LLC regarding Anadarko's Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement, rec. doc. 56, by Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone, and by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Michael North.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ziffer, Lee) Modified text/removed referral on 3/30/2021 (jls). Referred on 3/31/2021 (jls). (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Paul D. Palermo, Craig V. Sweeney, and Cynthia C. Roth to be substituted in place of Robert Vorhoff by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vorhoff, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) DEFICIENT. STIPULATION by Anadarko US Offshore, LLC re 69 Order on Motion for More Definite Statement, 58 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk, and filed by Plaintiff, Henry Nuncio Falcone (Ziffer, Lee) Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm). Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) DEFICIENT. ANSWER to 1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Pharos Marine Automatic Power, Inc. (Sweeney, Craig) Modified text on 3/24/2021 (bm). Modified on 3/25/2021 (bm). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE regarding service upon defendants Production Management Industries, LLC, CBS Corporation, Consol Gas Company, Crescent Materials Service, Inc., CSR Ltd., Edward L. Diefenthal, James R. Diefenthal, and OneBeacon America Insurance Company: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff show cause on or before 4/23/2021, by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, to report the status thereof or show cause why certain defendants should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/22/2021.(jls) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent IMO Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC (Oser, Daniel) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ORDER dismissing as moot #56 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/16/2021. (caa) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/9/2021.(cwa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, #7 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. Documents do not contain Section or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section I and Magistrate (2). (cwa) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Judge Jay C. Zainey no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey.(jrc) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Grefco, Inc.(Matherne, James) Modified text on 2/9/2021 (cwa). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Viking Pump, Inc.(Matherne, James) Modified text on 2/9/2021 (cwa). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Signed by Judge Janis van Meerveld on 2/8/2021. (NEF: Judge Currault)(ajn) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation. (lt) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2020-10058, F-7 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8721616) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, XH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E Part 1 of 5, #7 Exhibit E Part 2 of 5, #8 Exhibit E Part 3 of 5, #9 Exhibit E Part 4 of 5, #10 Exhibit E Part 5 of 5, #11 Notice of Removal to State Court, #12 Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties) Attorney John Allain Viator added to party Exxon Mobil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John Allain Viator added to party ExxonMobil Oil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John Allain Viator added to party XH, LLC(pty:dft).(Viator, John) Modified text on 2/8/2021 (lt). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anadarko U.S. Offshore Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CALLON PETROLEUM COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where United Bulk Terminals Davant, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Grefco, Inc. is a litigant