This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/21/2021 at 08:48:22 (UTC).

Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC v. Metaverse Law Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Falcon Rappaport Berkman PLLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Metaverse Law Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07905

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC

Defendant

Metaverse Law Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moish Eli Peltz

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Email Thread

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Cease and Desist Letter

#2

#3

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff alleges that venue is proper because Defendant "threatened a trademark infringement claim against a business in the State of New York and this District by sending a cease and desist letter to [Plaintiff] in the State of New York." (Dkt. No. 1 at 2). But the cease- and-desist letter, attached to the Complaint as an exhibit, is addressed to Plaintiff's office in Rockville Centre (Dkt. No 1, Exhibit 2), which is located within the Eastern District of New York. Plaintiff is therefore directed to show cause within twenty-one days as to why the Court should not, sua sponte, transfer the case to the Eastern District of New York. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/23/2021) (js) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Email Thread

5 #2

Exhibit 2 - Cease and Desist Letter

#6

(#6) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Peltz, Moish) Modified on 9/24/2021 (sj). (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to METAVERSE LAW CORPORTATION, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC..(Peltz, Moish) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metaverse Law Corporation..(pc) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

#9

(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC..(Peltz, Moish) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC..(Peltz, Moish) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AT #4 IS DISSOLVED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Text Only Order) (Oetken, J.) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #4 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC..(Peltz, Moish) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC..(Peltz, Moish) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metaverse Law Corporation..(pc) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to METAVERSE LAW CORPORTATION, re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC..(Peltz, Moish) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT TRADEMARK FORM. Notice to Attorney Moish Eli Peltz to RE-FILE re: Document No. #6 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is not correct; the Date Filed field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form is incorrect. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form Do not re-file the form. The Court has corrected the deficiency/deficiencies.. (sj) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Peltz, Moish) Modified on 9/24/2021 (sj). (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Metaverse Law Corporation. Document filed by Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Thread, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cease and Desist Letter).(Peltz, Moish) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff alleges that venue is proper because Defendant "threatened a trademark infringement claim against a business in the State of New York and this District by sending a cease and desist letter to [Plaintiff] in the State of New York." (Dkt. No. 1 at 2). But the cease- and-desist letter, attached to the Complaint as an exhibit, is addressed to Plaintiff's office in Rockville Centre (Dkt. No 1, Exhibit 2), which is located within the Eastern District of New York. Plaintiff is therefore directed to show cause within twenty-one days as to why the Court should not, sua sponte, transfer the case to the Eastern District of New York. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/23/2021) (js) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT TRADEMARK FORM. Notice to Attorney Moish Eli Peltz to RE-FILE re: Document No. #3 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Patent or Trademark Number field section on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark reflects an error in Trademark No. provided on form that does not correspond to pleading. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (vf) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Moish Eli Peltz. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC, Metaverse Law Corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Moish Eli Peltz to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT- ERROR - AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Peltz, Moish) Modified on 9/23/2021 (vf). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Peltz, Moish) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25094466)Document filed by Falcon Rappaport & Berkman PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Thread, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cease and Desist Letter).(Peltz, Moish) Modified on 9/23/2021 (vf). (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less